RCR Farms LLC v. Federal Crop Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: RCR Farms LLC
Defendant: Federal Crop Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01602
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon c/o US Dept of Justice defendant(s) Federal Crop Insurance Corporation served on 6/30/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Todd, Jeff)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Federal Crop Insurance Corporation served on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Todd, Jeff)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Colorado US Attorney defendant(s) Federal Crop Insurance Corporation served on 6/26/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Todd, Jeff)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/17/2020. (athom, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Federal Crop Insurance Corporation by Plaintiff RCR Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Todd, Jeff)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summonses submitted are on incorrect form, and only one summons can be issued per named defendant. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (cmadr, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Federal Crop Insurance Corporation by Plaintiff RCR Farms LLC. (Todd, Jeff)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeff L. Todd on behalf of RCR Farms LLC (Todd, Jeff)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Crop Insurance Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7325000)Attorney Jeff L. Todd added to party RCR Farms LLC(pty:pla), filed by RCR Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Todd, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RCR Farms LLC v. Federal Crop Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Crop Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RCR Farms LLC
Represented By: Jeff L. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?