Barlow v. Westin DIA Operator, LLC
Plaintiff: Timothy Barlow
Defendant: Westin DIA Operator, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01612
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:0185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant may file its reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss and its response to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify no later than August 19, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/30/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION for Order to Certify Determinative Question of Colorado Law to Colorado Supreme Court, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Westin DIA Operator, LLC. (Williams, Bradford)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, all counsel or parties who wish to participate in, or members of the public who wish to listen into, the Scheduling Conference set on August 11, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE by calling the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/24/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Timothy Barlow. (Harrison, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Order to Certify Determinative Question of Colorado Law to Colorado Supreme Court by Plaintiff Timothy Barlow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Harrison, Adam)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff Timothy Barlow's response to #14 Motion to Dismiss due on or before 7/22/2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/6/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
July 3, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Timothy Barlow. (Harrison, Adam)
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCKET SHEET by Defendant Westin DIA Operator, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet)(Williams, Bradford)
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Westin DIA Operator, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Bradford)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/12/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/4/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/11/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (nmarb, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Westin DIA Operator, LLC. Westin DIA Operator, LLC answer due 6/17/2020. (Williams, Bradford)
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison on behalf of Timothy BarlowAttorney Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison added to party Timothy Barlow(pty:pla) (Harrison, Adam)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradford J. Williams on behalf of Westin DIA Operator, LLCAttorney Bradford J. Williams added to party Westin DIA Operator, LLC(pty:dft) (Williams, Bradford)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David H. Miller on behalf of Timothy BarlowAttorney David H. Miller added to party Timothy Barlow(pty:pla) (Miller, David)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/5/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by attorney Steven M. Gutierrez. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Westin DIA Operator on 6 May 2020 (cmadr, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Individual and Class Action COMPLAINT against Westin DIA Operator, LLC, filed by Timothy Barlow.(cmadr, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Westin DIA Operator, LLC from District Court, City and County of Denver, CO, Case Number 2020CV31518. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7325838), filed by Westin DIA Operator, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wright Declaration, #2 Exhibit CBA, #3 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit State Court Summons, #6 Exhibit State Court Delay Reduction Order, #7 Exhibit State Court Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit State Court Gutierrez Entry of Appearance, #9 Exhibit State Court Williams Entry of Appearance, #10 Exhibit State Court Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond, #11 Exhibit State Court Miller Entry of Appearance, #12 Exhibit State Court Order Granting Extension of Time to Answer or Respond, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Court Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Federal Court Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Gutierrez, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barlow v. Westin DIA Operator, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Barlow
Represented By: Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison
Represented By: David H. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westin DIA Operator, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Gutierrez
Represented By: Bradford J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?