Scull v. Wolf
Plaintiff: Rebecca M Scull
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv01624
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 21 July 2020. Plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference and Other Related Deadlines #15 is DENIED. The Scheduling Conference set for August 12, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. is CONVERTED to a telephonic Status Conference at the same date and time. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. All other deadlines set in the court's June 12, 2020 Order #11 , including the pre-scheduling conference meeting, initial disclosure, and proposed scheduling order deadlines, are VACATED.(cmadr, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 MOTION to Reset filed by Rebecca M Scull. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/20/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Reschedule Scheduling Conference and other related deadlines, by Plaintiff Rebecca M Scull. (evana, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Bart Jafek on behalf of Chad F. WolfAttorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party Chad F. Wolf(pty:dft) (Jafek, Timothy)
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 Return Receipt of Service upon United States Attorney General (angar, )
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/16/20 DENYING without prejudice #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel. (nmarb, )
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/12/20 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/5/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Employment Discrimination Complaint for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 US Postal Service Certified Mail Receipt, #2 US Postal Service Certified Mail Receipt, #3 US Postal Service Certified Mail Receipt) (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM regarding #3 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel filed by Rebecca M Scull. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/9/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/ 9/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/9/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Drawing Case. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. After review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a), the Court has determined that this case does not appear to be appropriate for summary dismissal. Case randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez for all further proceedings and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All further pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01624-WJM. FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service shall serve process on any Defendants for whom personal service is required. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 06/09/2020. (rvill, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Rebecca M Scull. (cmadr, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Rebecca M Scull. (cmadr, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against Chad F. Wolf, filed by Rebecca M Scull.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scull v. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca M Scull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?