Vivos Therapeutics, Inc. v. Ortho-Tain, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vivos Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant: Ortho-Tain, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01634
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Neff, Nathan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathan Isaac Neff on behalf of Ortho-Tain, Inc. (Neff, Nathan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) Motion to Dismiss ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Nathan Isaac Neff added to party Ortho-Tain, Inc.(pty:dft) by Ortho-Tain, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Motion to Dismiss, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J to Motion to Dismiss)(Neff, Nathan)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/24/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #[5-1]) is due on or before 8/24/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/9/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivos Therapeutics, Inc.. Ortho-Tain, Inc. served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. (Gehret, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alec Paul Harris on behalf of Vivos Therapeutics, Inc.Attorney Alec Paul Harris added to party Vivos Therapeutics, Inc.(pty:pla) (Harris, Alec)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Michael Allen Gehret. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gehret, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ortho-Tain, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7327830)Attorney Michael Allen Gehret added to party Vivos Therapeutics, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Vivos Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gehret, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vivos Therapeutics, Inc. v. Ortho-Tain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivos Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Allen Gehret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Tain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?