Spencer v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Petitioner: Marsha Christine Spencer
Respondent: La Vista Correctional Facility Warden and Executive Director of CDOC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01649
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 Preliminary RESPONSE to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Attorney Jennifer S. Huss added to party Executive Director of CDOC(pty:res), Attorney Jennifer S. Huss added to party La Vista Correctional Facility Warden(pty:res)Attorney Jennifer S. Huss added to party Executive Director of CDOC(pty:res), Attorney Jennifer S. Huss added to party La Vista Correctional Facility Warden(pty:res) by Executive Director of CDOC, La Vista Correctional Facility Warden.(Huss, Jennifer)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service upon Dean Williams and Richard Persons (angar, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #5 Order to File Preliminary Response for Service of Process. (cmadr, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to File Preliminary Response. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order Respondents shall file a Preliminary Response that complies with this Order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/9/2020. (angar, )
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Leave to Proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/8/2020.(angar, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24. by Petitioner Marsha Christine Spencer. (trvo, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Marsha Christine Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: La Vista Correctional Facility Warden
Represented By: Jennifer S. Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Executive Director of CDOC
Represented By: Jennifer S. Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marsha Christine Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?