Mile High Spirits, LLC v. USA
Plaintiff: Mile High Spirits, LLC
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv01650
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon USA, District Counsel of the IRS defendant(s) USA served on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Harvey, Larry)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon United State of America, Office of the U.S. Attorney defendant(s) Mile High Spirits, LLC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mile High Spirits, LLC. Mile High Spirits, LLC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Harvey, Larry)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/10/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/23/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/30/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/8/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/8/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7329651)Attorney Larry D. Harvey added to party Mile High Spirits, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Mile High Spirits, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons USA - U.S. Attorney, #4 Summons IRS)(Harvey, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mile High Spirits, LLC v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mile High Spirits, LLC
Represented By: Larry D. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?