USA v. 1342 S East Ellicott Road, Calhan, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 1342 S East Ellicott Road, Calhan, Colorado, 6801 Mitchell Circle, Tampa, Florida, 33634, 39480 Highway 94, Rush, Colorado, 5949 Mohr Loop, Tampa, Florida, 33615, 5816 Little River Drive, Tampa, Florida, 33165, 2016 Jaguar XJ SAJWJ1CD5G8V94142 and $144,824.83 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCYREPRESENTING THE NET PROCEEDS OF THE SALE OF 6801 MITCHELL CIRCLE, TAMPA, FLORIDA
Case Number: 1:2020cv01662
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Lis Pendens Release of Lis Pendens 6801 Mitchel Circle by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Party. $144,824.83 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCYREPRESENTING THE NET PROCEEDS OF THE SALE OF 6801 MITCHELL CIRCLE, TAMPA, FLORIDA added. 6801 Mitchell Circle, Tampa, Florida, 33634 terminated by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/7/2020.(jgonz, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant Asset 6801 Mitchell Circle for Sales Proceeds Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 25 filed by USA. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/6/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant Asset 6801 Mitchell Circle for Sales Proceeds Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 25 by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Andrews, Tonya)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Addendum by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Andrews, Tonya)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/9/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (trvo, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 39480 Highway 94 by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 6801 Mitchell Circle by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 5949 Mohr Loop by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 5816 Little River Drive by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 1342 S East Ellicott Road by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against 1342 S East Ellicott Road, Calhan, Colorado, 2016 Jaguar XJ SAJWJ1CD5G8V94142, 39480 Highway 94, Rush, Colorado, 5816 Little River Drive, Tampa, Florida, 33165, 5949 Mohr Loop, Tampa, Florida, 33615, 6801 Mitchell Circle, Tampa, Florida, 33634 Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Andrews, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 1342 S East Ellicott Road, Calhan, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1342 S East Ellicott Road, Calhan, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6801 Mitchell Circle, Tampa, Florida, 33634
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 39480 Highway 94, Rush, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5949 Mohr Loop, Tampa, Florida, 33615
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5816 Little River Drive, Tampa, Florida, 33165
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2016 Jaguar XJ SAJWJ1CD5G8V94142
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $144,824.83 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCYREPRESENTING THE NET PROCEEDS OF THE SALE OF 6801 MITCHELL CIRCLE, TAMPA, FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?