Criss v. United Airlines Inc.
Plaintiff: Pamela Criss
Defendant: United Airlines Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01670
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 27 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Pamela Criss. (Poormon, Richard)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 31 July 2020. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. (Dkt. #24 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's current counsel, Mark T. Clouatre and Adrienne L. Toon of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, shall be permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendant. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove Mark T. Clouatre and Adrienne L. Toon from electronic notification in this matter. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding #24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by United Airlines Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/31/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant United Airlines Inc.. (Clouatre, Mark)
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew James Carafelli on behalf of United Airlines Inc.Attorney Andrew James Carafelli added to party United Airlines Inc.(pty:dft) (Carafelli, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER The upcoming hearing in this matter shall be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7/21/2020. Text Only Entry. (slibi, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Defendant United Airlines Inc. (Carafelli, Andrew)
July 7, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by United Airlines Inc..(Clouatre, Mark)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/ 18/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/18/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge William J. Martinez for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1670-WJM (angar, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Jude Peters on behalf of Pamela CrissAttorney James Jude Peters added to party Pamela Criss(pty:pla) (Peters, James)
June 16, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01670-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant United Airlines Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Toon, Adrienne)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant United Airlines Inc.. United Airlines Inc. answer due 7/7/2020. (Clouatre, Mark)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard P. Poormon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Richard P. Poormon added to party Pamela Criss(pty:pla) (Poormon, Richard)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #10 Order Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form to Richard P. Poormon, Justice for Colorado, 975 Lincoln Street, Suite 205-D, Denver, Colorado 80203. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 7/29/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 06/09/2020. (rvill, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Adrienne L. Toon by Adrienne Lee Toon on behalf of United Airlines Inc.Attorney Adrienne Lee Toon added to party United Airlines Inc.(pty:dft) (Toon, Adrienne)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Mark T. Clouatre by Mark Thomas Clouatre on behalf of United Airlines Inc. (Clouatre, Mark)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon United Airlines Inc. on 05/19/2020. (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against United Airlines Inc., filed by Pamela Criss.(trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines Holdings, Inc. for John (2) Doe, John (3) Doe, John (4) Doe, John 1 Does, United Airlines Inc.. (Clouatre, Mark)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John (4) Doe, United Airlines Inc., John (2) Doe, John 1 Does, John (3) Doe from District Court of Denver County, Case Number 2020cv31097. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7332203), filed by John (4) Doe, United Airlines Inc., John (2) Doe, John 1 Does, John (3) Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-2 State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit A-3 State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit A-4 State Court Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit A-5 State Court Notice of Change of Address (Justice for Colorado), #7 Exhibit A-6 State Court Notice of Change of Address (Poormon), #8 Exhibit A-7 State Court Return of Service, #9 Exhibit B State Court Docket Sheet as of June 9, 2020)(Clouatre, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Criss v. United Airlines Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Criss
Represented By: Richard P. Poormon
Represented By: James Jude Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Inc.
Represented By: Adrienne Lee Toon
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Andrew James Carafelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?