Russin v. Denver Area Better Business Bureau, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Russin
Defendant: Denver Area Better Business Bureau, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01672
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lindsey C. Herzog on behalf of Denver Area Better Business Bureau, Inc.Attorney Lindsey C. Herzog added to party Denver Area Better Business Bureau, Inc.(pty:dft) (Herzog, Lindsey)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/19/2020. (morti, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/19/2020. Discovery due by 2/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2021 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jason Russin. (Reese, Scott)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER The parties shall participate in the Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2020 10:30 AM TELEPHONICALLY by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/07/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sperber, Susan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Denver Area Better Business Bureau, Inc..(Sperber, Susan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Susan S. Sperber on behalf of Denver Area Better Business Bureau, Inc.Attorney Susan S. Sperber added to party Denver Area Better Business Bureau, Inc.(pty:dft) (Sperber, Susan)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Russin. Denver Area Better Business Bureau, Inc. served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Reese, Scott)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/12/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/10/2020. (jgonz, )
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/10/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/10/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Scott Frederick Reese. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury demand against Denver Area Better Business Bureau (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7332317)Attorney Scott Frederick Reese added to party Jason Russin(pty:pla), filed by Jason Russin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reese, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russin v. Denver Area Better Business Bureau, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Russin
Represented By: Scott Frederick Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Area Better Business Bureau, Inc.
Represented By: Susan S. Sperber
Represented By: Lindsey C. Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?