Chaudhary v. John Does 1 & II
Plaintiff: Noami A. Chaudhary
Defendant: John Does 1 & II
Case Number: 1:2020cv01673
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Edward Hopkins, Jr. is permitted to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. The Court notes that Plaintiff continues to be represented by Alexandra Tracy-Ramirez. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to delete Mr. Hopkins, Jr.'s email address from future ECF filings and electronic notifications in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/22/2020. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Edward Hopkins) by Plaintiff Noami A. Chaudhary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information for Alexandra Tracy-Ramirez by Alexandra Tracy-Ramirez (Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/17/20 GRANTING #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Early Discovery. Plaintiff may serve the requested subpoenas pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45, along with a copy of this Order, on the identified third parties.(nmarb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #5 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Early Discovery by Plaintiff Noami A. Chaudhary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit WebMD Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Healthgrades Subpoena, #3 Exhibit ISP Subpoena Instructions)(Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/11/20 re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Early Discovery filed by Noami A. Chaudhary. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 6/19/2020, Plaintiff shall submit thesubpoenas that she wishes to have issued so the Court may determine whetherauthorization is appropriate. (nmarb, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Early Discovery filed by Noami A. Chaudhary. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/10/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 9/10/2020 in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/10/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Early Discovery by Plaintiff Noami A. Chaudhary. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John 1-2 Doe (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7332498)Attorney Alexandra Tracy-Ramirez added to party Noami A. Chaudhary(pty:pla), filed by Noami A. Chaudhary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaudhary v. John Does 1 & II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noami A. Chaudhary
Represented By: Edward Charles Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra Tracy-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 & II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?