Rangel v. Barnhart
Petitioner: Roque Rangel
Respondent: J. A. Barnhart and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01675
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on August 4, 2020. Petitioner Roque Rangel's motion for a 30-day extension of time (ECF No. #16 ) is granted as follows: In accord with the Court's Order to Show Cause (ECF No. #15 ), Petitioner shall show cause in writing on or before August 31, 2020. (rvill, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b) and D.C. Colo. Local Rule 6.1 by Petitioner Roque Rangel. (rvill, )
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. It is ORDERED that Petitioner show cause in writing, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why the habeas corpus application pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction because he has an adequate and effective remedy pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 in the sentencing court: the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Abilene Division. If Petitioner fails to show cause within the time allowed, the application will be dismissed without further notice for lack of jurisdiction. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/30/2020. (rvill, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 14 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number COX095534. (rvill, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Roque Rangel. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rvill, )
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Petitioner to Cure Deficiencies. If Petitioner fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 06/10/2020. (rvill, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00019. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Petitioner filed a letter asking for an extension of time to respond to the Court's order requiring him to file an amended petition #7 . But the Court received Petitioner's amended petition (dated April 16, 2020) on April 21,2020. As a result, the request for an extension of time is denied as moot. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 6/9/2020) (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order: Petitioner, a prisoner confined in the United States Penitentiary in Florence, Colorado, filed a petition for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241. He also paid the filing fee. Florence, Colorado lies in the jurisdiction of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. As a result, the Court directs the Clerk to transfer this petition for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 6/9/2020) (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
June 9, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8, 9. Tue Jun 9 13:00:09 CDT 2020 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #5 Order filed by Roque Rangel. (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Petition filed by Roque Rangel, re: #5 Order. (jak) Modified on 6/8/2020 to update Respondent per Amended Petition (jak). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: The Court finds that Petitioner should be required to file an amended petition using the form to be furnished by the Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with any part of this order will result in the dismissal of the petition without further notice. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/12/2020) (Attachments: #1 Amended 2241 Petition) (jak) (Attachment #1 replaced on 03/13/2020). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
March 12, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Mar 12 15:56:50 CDT 2020 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency and Order : Roque Rangel must address the following deficiency: failure to pay the filing fee or submit an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 2/10/2020) (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Feb 10 10:25:34 CST 2020 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Roque Rangel, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]
January 21, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Tue Jan 21 15:19:03 CST 2020 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rangel v. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roque Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. A. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?