Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC v. Think Broccoli LLC et al
Plaintiff: Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC
Defendant: Brandon McEachern, Marcus Howard, Marcus Allen, Think Broccoli LLC, Cornerstone Capital Group LLC and Deonn Henderson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01680
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Order to Alternate Service by Plaintiff Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cohen, Justin)
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC. Deonn Henderson waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Cohen, Justin)
July 9, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC. Think Broccoli LLC served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Cohen, Justin)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC. Brandon McEachern served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Cohen, Justin)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC. Marcus Howard served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Cohen, Justin)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC. Cornerstone Capital Group LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Cohen, Justin)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/19/20, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/3/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/10/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#9-1] is August 27, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/19/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to All 6 Defendants by Plaintiff Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Def Cornerstone, #2 Proposed Document Def Howard, #3 Proposed Document Def Henderson, #4 Proposed Document Def McEachern, #5 Proposed Document Def Allen)(Sutz, Jesse)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jesse Sutz on behalf of Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLCAttorney Jesse Sutz added to party Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC(pty:pla) (Sutz, Jesse)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (trvo, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re #2 Complaint filed by Justin L. Cohen. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a complete signature block to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Marcus Allen, Cornerstone Capital Group LLC, Deonn Henderson, Marcus Howard, Brandon McEachern, Think Broccoli LLC Attorney Justin L. Cohen added to party Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC. (Fee paid $400.00 Receipt No. 1082-7333489) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Justin) Modified to add receipt number on 6/10/2020 (rvill, ).
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC v. Think Broccoli LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon McEachern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Think Broccoli LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Capital Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deonn Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenline CDF Subfund XXIII, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?