Young v. 18th Judicial Probation Department
Plaintiff: Shontella Young
Defendant: 18th Judicial Probation Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv01687
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Unopposed Motion to Stay. The Court has weighed the String Cheese factors, and finds that a 90-day stay of all pending deadlines is warranted. See String Cheese Incident, LLC v. Stylus Shows, Inc., No. 1:02-CV-01934-LTB-PA, 2006 WL 894955, at *2 (D. Colo. Mar. 30, 2006). Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Unopposed Motion [#13 ]. IT IS ORDERED that the case deadlines are modified as follows: Defendant's Answer or otherwise responsive pleading is due 11/9/2020; a Joint Status Report updating the Court on the status of the EEOC's investigation of Plaintiff's second charge of discrimination is due 11/2/2020; and all other deadlines and court hearings are VACATED and will be reset by the Court at a later date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/4/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay by Defendant 18th Judicial Probation Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Patten, Jack)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 10/6/2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#6 ] is due 10/6/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/7/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 18th Judicial Probation Department. All Defendants. (Patten, Jack)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Leslie Carol Schulze on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Leslie Carol Schulze added to party 18th Judicial Probation Department(pty:dft) (Schulze, Leslie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jack Davy Patten, III on behalf of 18th Judicial Probation DepartmentAttorney Jack Davy Patten, III added to party 18th Judicial Probation Department(pty:dft) (Patten, Jack)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Complaint for Service of Process. (cmadr, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Complaint for Service of Process. (cmadr, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (apesa, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as, 20-cv-01687-SKC, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/11/2020. (apesa, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. ORDERED that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. ORDERED that the court review the Employment Discrimination Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/11/2020.(apesa, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Shontella Young. (trvo, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against 18th Judicial Probation Department, filed by Shontella Young. (Attachment(s): #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. 18th Judicial Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shontella Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18th Judicial Probation Department
Represented By: Jack Davy Patten, III
Represented By: Leslie Carol Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?