Saunders v. San Juan Construction Company et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Carol Lee Saunders
Defendant: Wade Hogan, San Juan Construction Company, John Vinton and Kelly Neill
Case Number: 1:2020cv01692
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/05/2020. (slibi, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 70 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2020. Discovery due by 5/5/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/11/2021. Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C203. (slibi, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 69 Proposed Scheduling Order (by Plaintiff and Defendant) by Plaintiff Kelly Carol Lee Saunders. (Murray, Steven)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER The upcoming hearing in this matter shall be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/24/2020. Text Only Entry. (slibi, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 67 Party John Vinton, Wade Hogan and Kelly Neill terminated pursuant to #66 STIPULATIO of Dismissal of Party filed in this case on 8/24/2020. Text Only Entry (angar, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 66 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Kelly Neil, Wade Hogan and John Vinton by Defendants Wade Hogan, Kelly Neill, San Juan Construction Company, John Vinton. (Muhleisen, Michelle)
August 24, 2020 Motion(s) No Longer Referred: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/24/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AMENDED 53 Order Referring Case: Magistrate Judge Neureiter is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/24/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 August 2020. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Reset the Scheduling Conference (Dkt. #61 ), is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set on August 11, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET on October 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM regarding #61 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Kelly Carol Lee Saunders. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/11/2020. Text Only Entry (angar, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Thomas H. Mitchiner by Thomas H. Mitchiner on behalf of Kelly Carol Lee Saunders Attorney Thomas H. Mitchiner added to party Kelly Carol Lee Saunders (pty:pla) (Mitchiner, Thomas)
August 10, 2020 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Kelly Carol Lee Saunders. (Murray, Steven)
August 4, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Attorneys for the Plaintiff by Steven Lee Murray on behalf of Kelly Carol Lee Saunders Attorney Steven Lee Murray added to party Kelly Carol Lee Saunders (pty:pla) (Murray, Steven)
August 4, 2020 Filing 59 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Wade Hogan, Kelly Neill, San Juan Construction Company, John Vinton. (Reid, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #57 & #47 to William Fenton Sink Dillingham Transportation Bldg. 735 Bishop Street, Suite 400Honoloulu, HawaiI 96813 and to Kelly Carol Lee Saunders 1350 Ala Moana Boulevard #1008 Honolulu, HI 96814-4210. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 30 July 2020. The upcoming hearing in this matter shall be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER The upcoming hearing in this matter shall be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7/30/2020. Text Only Entry. (slibi, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM regarding #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wade Hogan, Kelly Neill, John Vinton. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/30/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/ 30/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/30/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 52 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #51 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01692-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 51 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Wade Hogan, Kelly Neill, San Juan Construction Company, John Vinton All parties do not consent.. (Reid, Steven)
June 29, 2020 Filing 50 San Juan Construction Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by San Juan Construction Company.(Reid, Steven)
June 29, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Wade Hogan, Kelly Neill, John Vinton. (Reid, Steven)
June 12, 2020 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Reid, Steven)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 7/28/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 06/11/2020. (rvill, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven R. Reid on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party Wade Hogan(pty:dft), Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party Kelly Neill(pty:dft), Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party San Juan Construction Company(pty:dft), Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party John Vinton(pty:dft) (Reid, Steven)
June 11, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Roger Glenn Trim on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Roger Glenn Trim added to party Wade Hogan(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Glenn Trim added to party Kelly Neill(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Glenn Trim added to party San Juan Construction Company(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Glenn Trim added to party John Vinton(pty:dft) (Trim, Roger)
June 10, 2020 Filing 44 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 43 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 42 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 41 Case transferred in from District of Hawaii; Case Number 1:19-cv-00631. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
June 8, 2020 Case transferred to District of Colorado. Original file, copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent via CM/ECF. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER AND (2) TRANSFERRING ACTION re #19 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 6/8/2020. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss or transfer is GRANTED in part , and this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 39 EP: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held.Discussion had regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue [ECF 19] pending before District Judge Otake. Settlement discussions premature at this time.Telephone Conference set for 08/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Courtroom Manager to provide call-in information. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 38 EO: Call-in information for the Telephone Conference set for 06/04/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Participants to call in per the instructions below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code (2070326) when prompted followed by the pound (#) sign.3. Message will say "To join the conference as host press star (*) otherwise press pound (#).4. Press pound (#). Message will say "The host has not yet arrived, please standby".5. You will hear "At the tone state your name." You will then be connected to the Conference. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 37 EO: Pursuant to the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency filed on April 16, 2020, and Local Rule 7.1, the Court concludes that #19 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue can be decided without oral argument. The hearing set for 5/8/2020 is VACATED and REMOVED from the Court's calendar. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, #35 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Wade Hogan, Kelly Neill, San Juan Construction Company, John Vinton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Kelly Neill)(Reid, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Filed January 21, 2020 filed by Kelly Carol Lee Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kelly Saunders, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Sink, William) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 34 EO: The Court GRANTS #33 Defendants' Unopposed Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Motion to Dismiss Hearing. Steven R. Reid is authorized to participate telephonically. He shall provide the courtroom manager (808-541-3085) with the number at which he can be reached. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 33 Amended MOTION Motion to Appear Telephonically at the Motion to Dismiss Hearing re 28 Notice of Hearing on Motion, Steven R. Reid appearing for Defendants Wade Hogan, Kelly Neill, San Juan Construction Company, John Vinton (Reid, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION For Leave To Appear Telephonically at the Motion to Dismiss Hearing re 28 Notice of Hearing on Motion, Steven R. Reid appearing for Defendants Wade Hogan, Kelly Neill, San Juan Construction Company, John Vinton (Reid, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 3/12/2020. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 30 EO: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Court confirms hearing on [ECF 19] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue set for May 8, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. before District Judge Otake.Telephone Status Conference set for June 4, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 9:00 a.m. on 05/10/2021 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 03/30/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 02/09/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Telephone Conference is set for at 06/04/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/9/2020. Discovery due by 03/12/2021. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 29 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Reid, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #19 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue:Motion Hearing is set for 5/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Opposition is due 3/27/2020, Reply is due 4/10/2020.(shm) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 27 EO: Pursuant to the request of Counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 02/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. is CONTINUED to 9:00 a.m. on 03/11/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by William Fenton Sink on behalf of Kelly Carol Lee Saunders on behalf of Kelly Carol Lee Saunders. (Sink, William) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 25 EO: The Court is in receipt of a letter from Plaintiff Kelly Saunders, dated 1/27/20, requesting appointment of pro bono counsel. Plaintiff states that despite contacting over a dozen employment attorneys in Honolulu and leaving a message on the Hawaii Bar Association Lawyer Referral & Information System's voicemail, Plaintiff has not been able to secure legal representation. Plaintiff's letter shall be construed as a motion for appointment of pro bono counsel. Plaintiff states that Plaintiff never wanted to file a federal lawsuit and that it was Plaintiff's intent to proceed no further than the EEOC's investigation. Plaintiff also explains that Plaintiff needs counsel because Plaintiff is at a considerable disadvantage without one.Despite Plaintiff's intentions, Plaintiff filed a lawsuit in this Court. Even though Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, Plaintiff is required to "abide by all local, federal, and other applicable rules and/or statutes" when litigating this case. LR81.1. These rules include the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii ("LR") and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure ("FRCP"). Among other things, these rules explain procedures for filings in federal court. Plaintiff should review these rules. "Generally, a person has no right to counsel in civil actions." Palmer v. Valdez, 560 F.3d 965, 970 (9th Cir. 2009) (citation omitted). When seeking appointment of pro bono counsel, the Court is required to consider the following three factors: (1) plaintiff's financial resources; (2) efforts made by plaintiff to secure counsel on his or her own; and (3) the merits of plaintiff's claims. Johnson v. U.S. Treasury Dept., 27 F.3d 415, 416-17 (9th Cir. 1994) (citation omitted). In addition, the court must consider whether exceptional circumstances exist. A finding of exceptional circumstances "requires at least an evaluation of the likelihood of the plaintiff's success on the merits and an evaluation of the plaintiff's ability to articulate his claims 'in light of the complexity of the issues involved.'" Agyeman v. Corr. Corp. of America, 390 F.3d 1101, 1103 (9th Cir. 2004) (citing Wilborn v. Escalderon, 789 F.2d 1328, 1331 (9th Cir. 1986)) (citation omitted).The Court cannot find that Plaintiff's explanations satisfy these three factors. Although Plaintiff discusses Plaintiff's efforts made to secure counsel, the inability to get in touch with counsel falls short of showing that sufficient efforts were made. The Court also cannot find that exceptional circumstances exist. Accordingly, Plaintiff's request for appointment of pro bono counsel is DENIED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Kelly Carol Lee Saunders haS been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00631 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Kelly Carol Lee Saunders shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 30, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the Notice electronically the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 22 Consent Election Form [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 21 EO: The Court continues the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 01/27/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rom Trader to 02/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER in Courtroom 5. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Kelly Carol Lee Saunders has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 20 Defendants' Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Reid, Steven) Modified on 1/23/2020 (emt, ). [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Steven R. Reid appearing for Defendants Wade Hogan, Kelly Neill, San Juan Construction Company, John Vinton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kelly Neill, #2 Exhibit B - Overseas Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Wade Hogan, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of John Vinton)(Reid, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 EO: Pursuant to his request, Mr. Steven R. Reid, will appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 01/27/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rom Trader. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Kelly Carol Lee Saunders have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Rom A. Trader from Jeffrey S. Portnoy, Esq., dated January 15, 2020, Re: Request to permit pro hac vice counsel Steven R. Reid, Esq. to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, scheduled for January 27, 2020. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ROGER G. TRIM re #14 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/9/2020. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Kelly Carol Lee Saunders shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 9, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the order electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO STEVEN R. REID re #13 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/9/2020. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Kelly Carol Lee Saunders shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 9, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the order electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Roger G. Trim, Esq.] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2314377.Jeffrey S. Portnoy appearing for Defendants Wade Hogan, Kelly Neill, San Juan Construction Company, John Vinton (Portnoy, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/9/2020 (emt, ). [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Steven R. Reid, Esq.] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2314367.Jeffrey S. Portnoy appearing for Defendants Wade Hogan, Kelly Neill, San Juan Construction Company, John Vinton (Portnoy, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/9/2020 (emt, ). [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelly Carol Lee Saunders. San Juan Construction for Kelly Neill waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Carol Lee Saunders. San Juan Construction Company waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the issued summonses, ECF Nos. #7 , #8 , #9 , and #10 were served by First Class Mail to Kelly Carol Lee Saunders at the address of record on November 22, 2019 (the Proof of Service portion of the summons form was included in the mailing to Plaintiff). (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to John Vinton. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Wade Hogan. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kelly Neill. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to San Juan Construction Company. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/27/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI027720 re #1 Complaint. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Kelly Carol Lee Saunders. (emt, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION (JURY TRIAL ) against All Defendants - filed by Kelly Carol Lee Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Sue, #2 (Proposed) Summons to San Juan Construction Company, #3 (Proposed) Summons to Kelly Neill, #4 (Proposed) Summons to Wade Hogan, #5 (Proposed) Summons to John Vinton) (emt, ) Modified on 11/22/2019 ECF No. #3 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI027720 re 1 Complaint. (emt, ). [Transferred from Hawaii on 6/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. San Juan Construction Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Hogan
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Represented By: Steven R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan Construction Company
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Represented By: Steven R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vinton
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Represented By: Steven R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Neill
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Represented By: Steven R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Carol Lee Saunders
Represented By: Steven Lee Murray
Represented By: Thomas H. Mitchiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?