Montoya v. University of Colorado
Plaintiff: Lupita Montoya
Defendant: University of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2020cv01695
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER The parties shall participate in the Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2020 10:45 AM TELEPHONICALLY by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/07/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #12 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/7/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Lupita Montoya All parties consent.. (DeFazio, Ariel)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Hermine Kallman by Hermine Kallman on behalf of University of ColoradoAttorney Hermine Kallman added to party University of Colorado(pty:dft) (Kallman, Hermine)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Erica Weston by Erica M. Weston on behalf of University of ColoradoAttorney Erica M. Weston added to party University of Colorado(pty:dft) (Weston, Erica)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lupita Montoya. University of Colorado waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (DeFazio, Ariel)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/20/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 8/6/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/13/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/11/2020. (jgonz, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #5 Order of Recusal, This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01698 STV. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Upon review of the file of this case, I conclude that I must recuse myself from further service in this case because of my professional relationship with the University of Colorado. It is, therefore, ORDERED that the judge's file be returned to the clerk and that the case be reassigned by random draw, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/11/2020. (evana, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charlotte Noelle Sweeney on behalf of Lupita MontoyaAttorney Charlotte Noelle Sweeney added to party Lupita Montoya(pty:pla) (Sweeney, Charlotte)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against University of Colorado (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7335550)Attorney Ariel Beryl DeFazio added to party Lupita Montoya(pty:pla), filed by Lupita Montoya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(DeFazio, Ariel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montoya v. University of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Colorado
Represented By: Erica M. Weston
Represented By: Hermine Kallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupita Montoya
Represented By: Charlotte Noelle Sweeney
Represented By: Ariel Beryl DeFazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?