Palmer v. Robinson
Defendant: Colorado DOC Director, Governor, Denver City County Jail Sheriff and Colorado Attorney General
Petitioner: James Dion Palmer
Respondent: David A. Robinson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01700
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 07/20/2020. Plaintiff will be given one more opportunity to cure the remaining deficiencies and must do so on or before August 14, 2020. Plaintiff is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to cure all of the deficiencies within the time allowed. (athom, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Petitioner James Dion Palmer. (evana, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Colorado Governor, Attorney General, Colorado DOC Director, Denver City County Jail Sheriff, filed by James Dion Palmer.(evana, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. It is ORDERED that the clerk of the court mail to Applicant, together with a copy of this order, blank copies of the following forms: Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915; Prisoner Complaint. If Applicant fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 06/11/2020. (athom, ) (forms mailed as ordered)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Petitioner James Dion Palmer. (cmadr, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by James Dion Palmer.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David A. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Dion Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado DOC Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver City County Jail Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?