Knoen-Hickerson v. FerrellGas LP
Plaintiff: Keyada Knoen-Hickerson
Defendant: FerrellGas LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv01703
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #10 Amended Complaint for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Marshal Service Form) (alave, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DRAWING CASE. After review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a), the court has determined that this case does not appear to be appropriate for summary dismissal. This case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all further proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/14/2020. All future filings should be designated as 20-cv-2703 KMT (evana, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against FerrellGas LP, filed by Keyada Knoen-Hickerson. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claims)(evana, )
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #6 ) is DENIED as moot because Plaintiff already has been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this action, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/13/2020.(evana, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 Second AMENDED Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against FerrellGas LP, filed by Keyada Knoen-Hickerson. (Attachments: #1 letter)(evana, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against FerrellGas LP, filed by Keyada Knoen-Hickerson.(evana, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Keyada Knoen-Hickerson. (evana, )
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended complaint that complies with this order. That, if Plaintiff fails within the time allowed to file an amended complaint that complies with this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/12/2020. (evana, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/11/2020.(evana, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Keyada Knoen-Hickerson. (cmadr, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against FerrellGas LP, filed by Keyada Knoen-Hickerson.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knoen-Hickerson v. FerrellGas LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyada Knoen-Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FerrellGas LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?