Winter v. Broe Management Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Heidi Winter
Defendant: Pat Broe and Broe Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01710
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/29/20. (amont, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 7/29/2020. Discovery due by 2/5/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2021. Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2020. Final Pretrial and Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/6/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. A five (5) day Jury Trial is set to commence on 6/7/2021 08:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, )
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT CASE PRACTICE AND TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/29/2020. (skclc1)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER The upcoming hearing in this matter before Magistrate Judge Crews shall be conducted via telephone. The parties shall call the Court provided conference line as a participant at 888.251.2909, Access Code 5662814# at the scheduled time. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. Text Only Entry (amont, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Broe Management Company, LLC. (O'Brien, Sean)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/15/2020. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1710-SKC (angar, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Heidi Winter All parties consent.. (Lapin, Juli)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Broe Management Company, LLC.(Benson, Gary)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #6 Complaint, #7 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Heidi Winter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Lapin, Juli)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 7/22/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/16/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, )
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6 /15/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/15/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Juli Elizabeth Lapin on behalf of Heidi WinterAttorney Juli Elizabeth Lapin added to party Heidi Winter(pty:pla) (Lapin, Juli)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (trvo, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pat Broe, Broe Management Company, LLC, filed by Heidi Winter.(trvo, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Pat Broe, Broe Management Company, LLC, filed by Heidi Winter.(trvo, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by attorney Gary J. Benson. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fees received. Financial notified and refunds are pending. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Broe Management Company, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company,, Pat Broe (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7337345), filed by Broe Management Company, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company,, Pat Broe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Original Complain, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Original Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Combined Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Waiver and Acceptance, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F (1 of 2) - Pretrial Order, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F (2 of 2) - Pretrial Order, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Delay Reduction Order, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - Entry of Appearance, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Notice to State Court, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brien, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winter v. Broe Management Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Broe
Represented By: Gary J. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broe Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Gary J. Benson
Represented By: Sean Joseph O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Winter
Represented By: Juli Elizabeth Lapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?