Geremaia v. NBH Bank
Plaintiff: Armine Avagyan Geremaia
Defendant: NBH Bank and NBH Bank a division of NBH Bank doing business as Community Banks of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2020cv01721
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331cr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/31/20 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/24/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/21/2020. (ebuch)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Welch, Sara)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant NBH Bank's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by NBH Bank.(Welch, Sara)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hailey C. Perkins on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Hailey C. Perkins added to party NBH Bank(pty:dft) (Perkins, Hailey)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sara Elizabeth Welch on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Sara Elizabeth Welch added to party NBH Bank(pty:dft) (Welch, Sara)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armine Avagyan Geremaia. NBH Bank served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Brake, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against NBH Bank, d/b/a Community Banks of Colorado, a division of NBH Bank (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7338554)Attorney Andrew T. Brake added to party Armine Avagyan Geremaia(pty:pla), filed by Armine Avagyan Geremaia. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Brake, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geremaia v. NBH Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBH Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBH Bank a division of NBH Bank doing business as Community Banks of Colorado
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Welch
Represented By: Hailey C. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armine Avagyan Geremaia
Represented By: Andrew T. Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?