Anderson v. Colorado Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Anderson
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2020cv01773
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT re: #4 Order Dismissing Case by Clerk on 8/6/2020. (evana, )
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Plaintiff failed to prosecute and cure the deficiencies as directed. That leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/6/2020. (evana, )
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That the Clerk of Court mail to Plaintiff, together with a copy of this order, a blank copy of the following forms: (1) Prisoner Complaint, (2) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff shall use these forms to cure the deficiencies. That, if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/22/2020. (mailed as ordered) (evana, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 Emergency MOTION for Compassionate Release, Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Joseph J. Anderson. (cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?