Andrews v. Eaton Metal Products, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marina Andrews
Defendant: Joanie Travis, Eaton Metal Products, LLC, Tim Travis and Talx UC Express
Case Number: 1:2020cv01782
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #4 Order of Dismissal. (apesa, )
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with the Court's Order (ECF No. #3 ) and failure to prosecute. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/29/2020. (apesa, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CURE DEFICIENCIES in writing and filed with the Courtwithin thirty (30) days from the date of this Order as to why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice as duplicative. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must be labeled with the civil action number identified on this Order. That Plaintiff cure the deficiencies identified herein within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. That if Plaintiff fails to show cause and cure deficiencies within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/18/2020. (evana, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION against Eaton Metal Products, LLC, Talx UC Express, Joanie Travis, Tim Travis, filed by Marina Andrews.(Attachment(s) added on #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jtorr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Eaton Metal Products, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanie Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Metal Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talx UC Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?