Robledo v. Williams
Petitioner: Craig Sebastian Robledo
Respondent: Dean Williams
Case Number: 1:2020cv01797
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DRAWING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01797-DDD. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher no longer assigned to case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/3/2020. (apesa, )
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. A certified application for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 has been filed by the applicant, alleging that he is being held illegally. Upon reading the application, good cause appears. It is ORDERED that Respondent show cause within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why the application for a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. It is further ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of Respondents answer to this show cause order Applicant may file a Reply, if any, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/3/2020. (apesa, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 Preliminary RESPONSE to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dean Williams.(Gellar, Nicole)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Response, filed by Petitioner Craig Sebastian Robledo. (evana, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/10/2020. Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Response (ECF No. #8 ) is GRANTED and Respondent shall have up to and including July 30, 2020, to file a Preliminary Response. Applicant will continue to have twenty-one (21) days from the filing of the Preliminary Response to submit a Reply, if any.(apesa, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Response by Respondent Dean Williams. (Gellar, Nicole)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, by Dean Williams. (apesa, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #5 Order to File Preliminary Response, and #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Service of Process. (trvo, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE PRELIMINARY RESPONSE. ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order Respondent shall file a Preliminary Response that complies with this Order. Within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of the Preliminary Response Applicant may file a Reply, if he desires. If Respondent does not intend to raise either of the affirmative defenses of timeliness or exhaustion of state court remedies, Respondent must notify the Court of that decision in the Preliminary Response, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/18/2020. (apesa, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF No. #2 ) is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that process shall not issue at this time, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/18/2020.(apesa, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Petitioner Craig Sebastian Robledo. (cmadr, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Craig Sebastian Robledo.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robledo v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean Williams
Represented By: Nicole S. Gellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Craig Sebastian Robledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?