Kempton et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Alyson Kempton and Scott Kempton
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01812
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: In light of the parties' #18 Notice of Settlement, the parties are DIRECTED to file appropriate dismissal documents in this matter by NO LATER THAN 9/11/2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/17/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Brophy, William)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/24/20 GRANTING #15 parties' Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the First Amended Complaint, and to Extend the Existing Deadlines and Date of the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. American Strategic Insurance Corp. answer now due 8/14/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order now due by 9/22/2020. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/20 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET to 9/29/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(nmarb, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #13 Scheduling Order, #14 Amended Complaint To Respond to the First Amended Complaint and Extend the Existing Deadlines and Date of the Scheduling Conference filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/24/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #13 Scheduling Order, #14 Amended Complaint To Respond to the First Amended Complaint and Extend the Existing Deadlines and Date of the Scheduling Conference by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Brophy, William)
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed by Scott Kempton, Alyson Kempton.(Archuleta, Nathanael)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2 July 2020.Consent Form due by 8/3/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp.. American Strategic Insurance Corp. answer due 6/26/2020. (Brophy, William)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 DISREGARD, NOTICE FILED IN ERROR Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) Modified on 6/22/2020 to address error (jtorr, ).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/22/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathanael Thomas Archuleta on behalf of Alyson Kempton, Scott KemptonAttorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Alyson Kempton(pty:pla), Attorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Scott Kempton(pty:pla) (Archuleta, Nathanael)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of District Court Civil Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon American Strategic Insurance Corp. on 05/21/2020. (jtorr, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT Pre-Trial Order. (jtorr, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp.'s Unopposed Motion for 14-Day Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. (jtorr, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed by Scott Kempton, Alyson Kempton.(jtorr, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation for American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Brophy, William)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Strategic Insurance Corp. from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2020CV031557. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7349776), filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Colorado Division of Insurance Company Consumer Inquiry, #2 Exhibit B - Appraisal Award Form, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 State Court - Complaint and Jury Demand, #5 State Court - Summons, #6 State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #7 State Court - Affidavit of Service, #8 State Court - Order Granting ASI Until 06-25-2020 to Respond to Complaint, #9 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #10 State Court - Pre-Trial Order, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ridley, Terence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kempton et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Represented By: William Michael Brophy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyson Kempton
Represented By: Nathanael Thomas Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Kempton
Represented By: Nathanael Thomas Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?