Curtis v. Lever Up Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julie Adams Curtis
Defendant: Russ Matthews, Chasefield Real Estate, LLC, Boccus Group LLC, Pakems LLC, Kellie Beiers, Harold Pine, Seth Everson, Jordan Pine, Chasefield Capital Inc., Lever Up Inc., John Does (1 - 10), SCB Global Capital Management, LLC and Walter Van Woudenberg
Case Number: 1:2020cv01873
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 18:2701
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Word Limitation for Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Kellie Beiers, Chasefield Capital Inc., Chasefield Real Estate, LLC, Lever Up Inc., Pakems LLC, Harold Pine, Jordan Pine, Walter Van Woudenberg. (Bernal, Patrick)
August 20, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles G. Crosse, IV on behalf of Russ Matthews, SCB Global Capital Management, LLCAttorney Charles G. Crosse, IV added to party Russ Matthews(pty:dft), Attorney Charles G. Crosse, IV added to party SCB Global Capital Management, LLC(pty:dft) (Crosse, Charles)
August 19, 2020 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. Seth Everson waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. Boccus Group LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 46 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Kellie Beiers, Chasefield Capital Inc., Chasefield Real Estate, LLC, Lever Up Inc., Pakems LLC, Harold Pine, Jordan Pine, Walter Van Woudenberg All parties do not consent.. (Bernal, Patrick)
August 11, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick J. Bernal on behalf of Kellie Beiers, Chasefield Capital Inc., Chasefield Real Estate, LLC, Lever Up Inc., Pakems LLC, Harold Pine, Jordan Pine, Walter Van WoudenbergAttorney Patrick J. Bernal added to party Kellie Beiers(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick J. Bernal added to party Chasefield Capital Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick J. Bernal added to party Chasefield Real Estate, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick J. Bernal added to party Lever Up Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick J. Bernal added to party Pakems LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick J. Bernal added to party Harold Pine(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick J. Bernal added to party Jordan Pine(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick J. Bernal added to party Walter Van Woudenberg(pty:dft) (Bernal, Patrick)
July 27, 2020 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. SCB Global Capital Management, LLC waiver sent on 7/22/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 27, 2020 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. Russ Matthews waiver sent on 7/15/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. Kellie Beiers waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. Jordan Pine waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. Walter Van Woudenberg waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. Harold Pine waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. Chasefield Real Estate, LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. Chasefield Capital Inc. waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. Pakems LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Adams Curtis. Lever Up Inc. waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Seth Everson by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kellie Beiers by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jordan Pine by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Russ Matthews by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Walter van Woudenberg by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Harold Pine by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Boccus Group, LLC by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS REQUEST as to SCB Global Capital Management, LLC by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chasefield Real Estate, LLC by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chasefield Capital Inc. by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Pakems LLC by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Lever Up Inc. by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/7/20 GRANTING #6 Plaintiff Julie Curtis's Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference. No later than July 28, 2020, Plaintiff shall serve the necessary Rule 45 subpoenas, which are tailored specifically to identify Defendants John Does 1-10. Status Report due by 8/28/2020.(nmarb, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 20 Administrative Notice : The 8-19 Summonses submitted are incomplete and will not be issued. All defendants must be listed in the caption - et al can not be used. Please complete the forms for issuance using the event Summons Request. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
July 3, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Seth Everson by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kellie Beiers by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jordan Pine by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Russ Matthews by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Walter van Woudenberg by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Harold Pine by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Bocuss Group, LLC by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to SCB Global Capital Management, LLC by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chasefield Real Estate, LLC by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chasefield Capital Inc. by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Pakems LLC by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Lever Up Inc. by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Limpus, Christopher)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #6 Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Julie Adams Curtis. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/2/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Julie Adams Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Limpus, Christopher)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference for 9/1/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/25/2020, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/1/2020. (jgonz, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/25/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7357117)Attorney Christopher Lee Limpus added to party Julie Adams Curtis(pty:pla), filed by Julie Adams Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Limpus, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Lever Up Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russ Matthews
Represented By: Charles G. Crosse, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasefield Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boccus Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pakems LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Beiers
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Pine
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Everson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Pine
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasefield Capital Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lever Up Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (1 - 10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCB Global Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Charles G. Crosse, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Van Woudenberg
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Adams Curtis
Represented By: Christopher Lee Limpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?