Epps et al v. City and County of Denver et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Blasingame, Apryl Alexander, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Zach Packard, Elisabeth Epps, Stanford Smith, Cidney Fisk, Black Lives Matter 5280, Hollis Lyman, Phillip Rothlein and Maya Rothlein
Defendant: City and County of Denver, David Abeyta, City of Aurora, CO, Officer Cory Budaj, Board of County Commissioners for Jefferson County Colorado, Jeff Shrader, Jonathan Christian, Keith Valentine, David McNamee, Patricio Serrant, Matthew Brukbacher, John and Jane Does 1-100, John and Jane Boes 1-50, Timothy Dreith, Anthony Hamilton, Patrick Phelan and Matthew Canino
Consolidated Defendant: Kevin Beasley, Heather R. Jossi, Chelsea Novotny, Zachary Moldenhauer, Jacqueline A. Velasquez, Anthony E. Tak, Andrew Nielsen, J. LNU, Paul Hogan, M. Davis, Christopher Cochran, Jacob Vaporis, Paul Pazen, Daniel Felkins, City and County of Denver, Colorado, James D. Williams, Thomas Pine, Vincent Porter, Michael O'Donnell, Kevin Carroll, Rick Beall, Marco Martinez, Justin Dodge, Richard D. Eberharter, Tana Cunningham, John Sampson and City of Aurora, Colorado
Consolidated Plaintiff: Ambrose Cruz, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Youssef Amghar, Johnathen Duran, Kelsey Taylor, Joe Deras, Sara Fitouri, Francesca Lawrence, Michael Acker and Claire Sannier
Interested Party: Baumgartner Law, LLC and Beem & Isley, PC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01878
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Jury Trial Day Two held on 3/8/2022. Evidence and testimony presented, trial continued. Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom. (jdyne, )
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Exhibit List Third Supplemental Exhibit List with Plaintiff's Stipulations by Denver Defendants by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Ringel, Andrew)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Juror Strike Sheet - redacted(jdyne, )
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Juror Strike Sheet - Unredacted - Level 3 - Viewable by Court Only. (jdyne, )
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Jury Trial Day One held on 3/7/2022. Jury selected, opening arguments given, trial continued. Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom. (jdyne, ) Text Only Entry
March 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 STIPULATION by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Macdonald, Timothy)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Exhibit List by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Consol Plaintiffs Joe Deras, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit List)(Sebba, Michael)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party by Consol Plaintiff Johnathen Duran. (Wang, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Witness List by Plaintiffs Apryl Alexander, Black Lives Matter 5280, Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Macdonald, Timothy)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Exhibit List by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Consol Plaintiffs Joe Deras, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List)(Wang, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Witness List by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Ringel, Andrew)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Exhibit List by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Ringel, Andrew)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 RESPONSE to #297 Trial Brief Second by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Macdonald, Timothy)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party by Consol Plaintiff Youssef Amghar. (Wang, Elizabeth)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #271 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/1/22.(jdyne, )
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER finding as moot #255 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Denver Defendants. A revised motion was filed at ECF No. #271 . By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/1/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) Modified on 3/1/2022 to edit linkage. (sphil, ).
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 REPLY to Response to #283 MOTION to Exclude THIRTEEN PLAINTIFFS FROM CLASS ACTION MEMBERSHIP IN 20-CV-01878-RBJ filed by Interested Parties Baumgartner Law, LLC, Beem & Isley, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Baumgartner, Stephen)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Preparation Conference held on February 23, 2022 before Judge Jackson. Pages: 1-127. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (smitc, )
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER ON CERTAIN PENDING NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS: 1. Denver's Motion to Preclude Independent Monitor Nicholas E. Mitchell as a Witness for Plaintiffs and Office of Independent Monitor Interview Memos as Evidence, ECF No. #169 : DENIED. 2. Plaintiffs' Motion to Limit the Expert Opinion Testimony of Steve IJames, ECF No. #244 : DENIED. 3. Plaintiffs' Motion to Limit the Expert Opinion Testimony of Josh Garcia, ECF No. #245 : DENIED. 4. Plaintiffs' [Four] Motions in Limine, ECF No. #246 . (Addressed at the February 23, 2022 hearing): GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART. 5. Plaintiffs' Motion to Bar Testimony from Marc Sears and Jason Petrucelli (Aurora Defendants' Non-Retained Experts), ECF No. #252 : DENIED. 6. Plaintiffs' Supplement to Motion in Limine No. 4 to Bar Untimely Witnesses, ECF No. #258 : GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART. 7. Fitouri plaintiffs' Motion to limit the Expert Opinion Testimony of Peter Davidov, ECF No. #270 : DENIED. 8. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Bar any Evidence of Plaintiffs Committing any Act that Warranted Use of Force on Them, ECF No. #272 : DENIED. 9. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to File Certain Exhibits Under Seal, ECF No. #285 : GRANTED. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/28/2022. (rbjsec.)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Trial Preparation Conference held on 2/23/2022. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting #253 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Timothy Dreith and Anthony Hamilton. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/22/2022.(rbjsec. )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 TRIAL BRIEF (SECOND) by Defendants Jonathan Christian, City and County of Denver, Keith Valentine. (Ringel, Andrew)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Exhibits in Support of #291 Response, Exhibit 3 (IA letter) to Response to Defendants' Trial Brief by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Wang, Elizabeth)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Alan Weiner on behalf of David Abeyta, City and County of DenverAttorney Robert Alan Weiner added to party David Abeyta(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Alan Weiner added to party City and County of Denver(pty:dft) (Weiner, Robert)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Mark Williams on behalf of Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee WedgeworthAttorney Brian Mark Williams added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Mark Williams added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Mark Williams added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Mark Williams added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Mark Williams added to party Maya Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Mark Williams added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Mark Williams added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Williams, Brian)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 Flash Drive to #286 Brief in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Elisabeth Epps. Location: 1st Floor Area, Box A-1-4. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 Flash Drive to #289 Brief in Opposition to Motion. Location: 1st Floor Area, Box A-1-4. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 RESPONSE to #267 Trial Brief by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Valentine Dep.), #2 Exhibit 2 (OIM Report), #3 Exhibit 4 (Mitchell Dep.))(Wang, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 RESPONSE to #283 MOTION to Exclude THIRTEEN PLAINTIFFS FROM CLASS ACTION MEMBERSHIP IN 20-CV-01878-RBJ filed by Consol Plaintiffs Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Ringel Ltr.))(Wang, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 BRIEF in Opposition to #253 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Rutahindurwa, Makeba)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff Joe Deras's Opposition to Jefferson County Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Consol Plaintiff Joe Deras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19)(Rutahindurwa, Makeba)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Draft Memo to #286 BRIEF in Opposition by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 37, #4 Exhibit 50, #5 Exhibit 54, #6 Exhibit 67, #7 Exhibit 70, #8 Exhibit 74, #9 Exhibit 76)(Wang, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/15/2022 to add document title and linkage. (sphil, ).
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 BRIEF in Opposition to #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment Revised by Denver Defendants filed by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 24, #23 Exhibit 25, #24 Exhibit 26, #25 Exhibit 27, #26 Exhibit 28, #27 Exhibit 29, #28 Exhibit 30, #29 Exhibit 31, #30 Exhibit 32, #31 Exhibit 33, #32 Exhibit 34, #33 Exhibit 35, #34 Exhibit 36, #35 Exhibit 38, #36 Exhibit 39, #37 Exhibit 40, #38 Exhibit 42, #39 Exhibit 43, #40 Exhibit 44, #41 Exhibit 45, #42 Exhibit 46, #43 Exhibit 47, #44 Exhibit 48, #45 Exhibit 49, #46 Exhibit 51, #47 Exhibit 52, #48 Exhibit 53, #49 Exhibit 55, #50 Exhibit 56, #51 Exhibit 57, #52 Exhibit 58, #53 Exhibit 59, #54 Exhibit 60, #55 Exhibit 61, #56 Exhibit 62, #57 Exhibit 63, #58 Exhibit 64, #59 Exhibit 65, #60 Exhibit 66, #61 Exhibit 68, #62 Exhibit 69, #63 Exhibit 71, #64 Exhibit 72, #65 Exhibit 73, #66 Exhibit 76)(Wang, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Certain Exhibits Under Seal by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Wang, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 RESPONSE to #272 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to bar any evidence of Plaintiffs committing any act that warranted the use of force against them filed by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Birkholz, Hollie)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION to Exclude THIRTEEN PLAINTIFFS FROM CLASS ACTION MEMBERSHIP IN 20-CV-01878-RBJ by Interested Parties Baumgartner Law, LLC, Beem & Isley, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Baumgartner, Stephen)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Joint STATUS REPORT regarding settlement by Consol Plaintiff Johnathen Duran. (Wang, Elizabeth)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Diana K. Sterk on behalf of Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee WedgeworthAttorney Diana K. Sterk added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Diana K. Sterk added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Diana K. Sterk added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Diana K. Sterk added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Diana K. Sterk added to party Maya Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Diana K. Sterk added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Diana K. Sterk added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Sterk, Diana)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Pursuant to #280 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Defendants, Parties Matthew Canino (Lieutenant), Kevin Carroll (Lieutenant), Justin Dodge (Sergeant), Richard D. Eberharter (Corporal), Marco Martinez (Sergeant), Michael O'Donnell (Lieutenant), Patrick Phelan (Commander), Thomas Pine (Lieutenant), Vincent Porter (Lieutenant), Anthony E. Tak (Officer, #00018), James D. Williams (Lieutenant), David Abeyta (Sergeant) and Rick Beall (Sergeant) are terminated on 2/8/2022. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Defendants Anthony Tak, Patrick Phelan, Matthew Canino, James Williams, Thomas Pine, Vincent Porter, Michael O'Donnell, Kevin Carroll, Rick Beall, David Abeyta, Marco Martinez, Justin Dodge, and Richard Eberharter by Consol Plaintiffs Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Joint STATUS REPORT regarding settlement by Consol Plaintiff Youssef Amghar. (Wang, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Trial Preparation Conference held on 2/4/2022. Additional Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 RESPONSE to #252 MOTION in Limine to Limit the Expert Opinion Testimony of Marc Sears and Jason Petrucelli (Aurora Defendants' Non-Retained Experts) filed by Defendants Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, City of Aurora, CO, David McNamee, Patricio Serrant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SPEARS DEPOSITION, #2 Exhibit B - PETRUCELLI DEPOSITION)(Evans, Isabelle)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 SECOND ORDER FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/3/22. (jdyne, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 RESPONSE to #270 MOTION in Limine to Limit the Testimony of Peter Davidov filed by Defendants Timothy Dreith, Anthony Hamilton. (Butler, Eric)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MOTION to Continue Trial by Defendants Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, City of Aurora, CO, David McNamee, Patricio Serrant. (Evans, Isabelle)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 Flash Drive to MOTION for Summary Judgment #253 by Defendant Timothy Dreith. Location: 1st Floor Area, Box A-1-2. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to bar any evidence of Plaintiffs committing any act that warranted the use of force against them by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wang, Elizabeth)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment Revised by Denver Defendants by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Ringel, Andrew)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION in Limine to Limit the Testimony of Peter Davidov by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Francesca Lawrence, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rutahindurwa, Makeba)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 RESPONSE to #258 MOTION in Limine No. 4 (Supplement to Motion in Limine No. 4) to bar undisclosed witnesses, #246 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1 through 4 Attorney Lindsay Michelle Jordan added to party Jonathan Christian(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay Michelle Jordan added to party Keith Valentine(pty:dft) filed by Defendants Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, Jonathan Christian, City and County of Denver, City of Aurora, CO, Anthony Hamilton, David McNamee, Patricio Serrant, Keith Valentine. (Jordan, Lindsay)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 Flash Drive to #259 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Cory Budaj. Location: 1st Floor Area, Box A-1-2. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 TRIAL BRIEF by Denver Defendants by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A OIM Report.pdf, #2 Exhibit B Mitchell Dep.pdf)(Ringel, Andrew)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 RESPONSE to #244 MOTION in Limine To Limit the Expert Opinion Testimony of Steve Ijames by Denver Defendants filed by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Ijames CV, #2 Exhibit B Ijames List of Prior Testimony)(Ringel, Andrew)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 RESPONSE to #245 MOTION in Limine to bar certain testimony of Josh Garcia under Rule 702 and Daubert filed by Defendants Timothy Dreith, Anthony Hamilton. (Butler, Eric)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #256 Motion for Leave to Restrict. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/31/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER denying #254 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Summary Judgment by Denver Defendants. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/31/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ERRATA re #253 MOTION for Summary Judgment Exhibit G - revised by Defendants Timothy Dreith, Anthony Hamilton. (Butler, Eric)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 BRIEF in Opposition to #254 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Summary Judgment by Denver Defendants filed by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE of Conventionally Submitted Materials by Defendants Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, City of Aurora, CO, David McNamee, Patricio Serrant (Lowe, Michael)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, City of Aurora, CO, David McNamee, Patricio Serrant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Conventionally Submitted I-J)(Lowe, Michael)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MOTION in Limine No. 4 (Supplement to Motion in Limine No. 4) to bar undisclosed witnesses by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Wang, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit M to MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant City and County of Denver.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N 40mm Operator Course Version 11.19, #2 Exhibit V Chart of Officer Injuries.)(Ringel, Andrew) Modified on 1/31/2022 to add document title and linkage. (sphil, ).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Ringel, Andrew)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Denver Defendants by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Phlean Depo, #2 Exhibit B Lt Canino Depo, #3 Exhibit C O'Donnell Depo, #4 Exhibit D Beall Depo, #5 Exhibit E Martinez Depo, #6 Exhibit F Carroll Depo, #7 Exhibit G DPD Operations Plan 5-28-20, #8 Exhibit H DPD Operations Plan 5-29-20, #9 Exhibit I DPD Operations Plan 5-30-20, #10 Exhibit J DPD Operations Plan 5-31-20, #11 Exhibit K DPD Operations Plan 6-1-20, #12 Exhibit L DPD Operations Plan 6-2-20, #13 Exhibit O ER Curfew to DRMC 5-30-20, #14 Exhibit P ER Curfew to DRMC 6-1-20, #15 Exhibit Q Chief Thomas Depo, #16 Exhibit R Citations with Additional Charge, #17 Exhibit S Message Summarizing Police Activity and Arrests, #18 Exhibit T Ops Manual at DEN 981 & 1010, #19 Exhibit U Chief Pazen Depo, #20 Exhibit W Table of Officer Injuries, #21 Exhibit X Table of Officer Injuries, #22 Exhibit Y Summary Data of Property Damage, #23 Exhibit Z Summary Data to City Buildings, #24 Exhibit AA Property Damage Table, #25 Exhibit BB Property Damage Glass, #26 Exhibit CC Damage Photos, #27 Exhibit DD Damage Quote, #28 Exhibit EE Arrest table)(Ringel, Andrew) Modified on 3/1/2022 (sphil, ).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Summary Judgment by Denver Defendants by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Ringel, Andrew)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Timothy Dreith, Anthony Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - JCSO After Action Report, #2 Exhibit B - Deras 8.11.21 Dep Tr, #3 Exhibit C - Golden PD Reports, #4 Exhibit D - JCSO 20-10539, #5 Exhibit E - Hamilton Dep Tr, #6 Exhibit F - Dreith Dep Tr, #7 Exhibit G - Deras 11.23.21 Dep Tr, #8 Exhibit H - conventionally submitted HALO video, #9 Exhibit I - Dreith Decl, #10 Exhibit J - Hamilton Decl, #11 Exhibit K - Arvada PD Reports, #12 Exhibit L - Garcia Dep Tr, #13 Exhibit M - conventionally submitted video Garcia Dep)(Butler, Eric)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MOTION in Limine to Limit the Expert Opinion Testimony of Marc Sears and Jason Petrucelli by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Francesca Lawrence, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wang, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Trial by Defendants David Abeyta, Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, Jonathan Christian, City and County of Denver, City of Aurora, CO, Timothy Dreith, Anthony Hamilton, David McNamee, Patricio Serrant, Keith Valentine, Consol Defendant Anthony E. Tak. (Birkholz, Hollie)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER Following In Camera Review by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/24/22. (jdyne, )
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Macdonald, Timothy)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING LETTERS OF INTENT AND RESPONSES REGARDING POTENTIAL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #236 Notice, #237 Notice, #238 Notice, #239 Notice, #240 Notice, and #241 Notice. See order for details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/21/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather Dawn Kuhlman on behalf of Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, David McNamee, Patricio SerrantAttorney Heather Dawn Kuhlman added to party Matthew Brukbacher(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Dawn Kuhlman added to party Cory Budaj(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Dawn Kuhlman added to party David McNamee(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Dawn Kuhlman added to party Patricio Serrant(pty:dft) (Kuhlman, Heather)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1 through 4 by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Rutahindurwa, Makeba)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION in Limine to bar certain testimony of Josh Garcia under Rule 702 and Daubert by Consol Plaintiff Joe Deras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Wang, Elizabeth)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MOTION in Limine To Limit the Expert Opinion Testimony of Steve Ijames by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rutahindurwa, Makeba)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting #242 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mollie DiBrell. Attorney Mollie DiBrell is withdrawn. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/19/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mollie DiBrell by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Macdonald, Timothy)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE re #237 Notice (Other) Response to Denver Defendants' Notice of Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth (Wang, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE re #238 Notice (Other) Response to Aurora Defendants' Notice of Intent to File for Summary Judgment by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth (Wang, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE re #236 Notice (Other) Response to Defendants Dreith and Hamilton's Notice of Intent to File for Summary Judgment by Consol Plaintiff Joe Deras (Wang, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, City of Aurora, CO, David McNamee, Patricio Serrant (Lowe, Michael)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment on behalf of the Denver Defendants by Defendant City and County of Denver, Consol Defendant Anthony E. Tak (Ringel, Andrew)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of Intent to File for Summary Judgment by Defendants Timothy Dreith, Anthony Hamilton (Butler, Eric)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #234 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai is withdrawn. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/5/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Macdonald, Timothy)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting #232 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender is withdrawn. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/30/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Timothy Dreith, Anthony Hamilton. (Bender, Rachel)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Aurora Defendants' ANSWER to #178 Amended Complaint, by Matthew Brukbacher, City of Aurora, CO, David McNamee, Patricio Serrant.(Evans, Isabelle)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Officer Keith Valentines ANSWER to #178 Amended Complaint, by Keith Valentine.(Birkholz, Hollie)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Officer Jonathan Christians ANSWER to #178 Amended Complaint, by Jonathan Christian.(Birkholz, Hollie)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ANSWER to #219 Amended Complaint, Attorney Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender added to party Timothy Dreith(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender added to party Anthony Hamilton(pty:dft) by Timothy Dreith, Anthony Hamilton.(Bender, Rachel)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Thomas Butler on behalf of Timothy Dreith, Anthony HamiltonAttorney Eric Thomas Butler added to party Timothy Dreith(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Thomas Butler added to party Anthony Hamilton(pty:dft) (Butler, Eric)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 STIPULATION Establishing Expert Witness Deadlines for Aurora and Jeffco Defendants by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Wang, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Denver Defendants' ANSWER to #219 Amended Complaint, by David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Anthony E. Tak.(Jordan, Lindsay)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 City of Aurora's ANSWER to #219 Amended Complaint, And Jury Demand by Cory Budaj, City of Aurora, CO.(Evans, Isabelle)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 Flash Drive (In Camera Review) re: 216 Order. Location: 1st Floor Area, Box A-1-2. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 SUMMONES issued by Clerk as to Deputy Sheriff Anthony Hamilton and Deputy Sheriff Timothy Dreith (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, )
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Sheriff Jeff Shrader of Jefferson County, Colorado by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor (Wang, Elizabeth)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Deputy Sheriff Anthony Hamilton, Deputy Sheriff Timothy Dreith Deputy Sheriff re #219 Amended Complaint, by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Francesca Lawrence, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wang, Elizabeth)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Third AMENDED Class Action COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Youssef Amghar, Sara Fitouri, Kelsey Taylor, Jacquelyn Parkins, Joe Deras, Claire Sannier, Johnathen Duran. (document filed in this case pursuant to [#218] Order). (sphil, )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting #215 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #153 Amended Complaint (Agreed Motion to file Third Amended Complaint). The Court requests that the Clerk of Court docket the Third Amended Complaint at ECF No. 215-1. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/23/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #194 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 46 Scheduling Order and Trial Date. The Court does not authorize additional discovery by or against the Denver defendants. The Court authorizes the Jeffco defendants as a group to serve three interrogatories, three requests for production, and three requests for admission on each of the two plaintiff groups (Epps and Fitouri). The two plaintiff groups collectively may serve three interrogatories, three requests for production, and three request for admissions on the Jeffco defendants as a group. The Court authorizes the Aurora defendants as a group to serve three interrogatories, three requests for production, and three requests for admission on each of the two plaintiff groups (Epps and Fitouri). The two plaintiff groups collectively may serve three interrogatories, three requests for production, and three request for admissions on the Aurora defendants as a group. Depositions: plaintiffs collectively: 2 depositions of the Jeffco defendants and 2 depositions of the Aurora defendants, not to exceed four hours per deposition. Each of the Jeffco and Aurora defendant groups may take 2 depositions, not to exceed four hours. The Jeffco defendants may also reopen the deposition of Joe Deras for two additional hours. The Aurora defendants may also reopen the depositions of Jonathan Duran and Zach Packard for two additional hours for each deponent. The discovery cutoff for the foregoing new discovery is December 30, 2021. The dispositive motions deadline for all parties is extended to January 28, 2022. Responses are due February 11, 2022. No replies. Page limits for dispositive motions: plaintiffs and Denver defendants: 25 total, meaning the plaintiffs collectively have 25 pages to use as they see fit, and the Denver defendants have 25 pages to use as they see fit. Jeffco and Aurora: 15 pages total for each of them, to use as they see fit. The Court will not have the time available to process more than what will amount to 80 total pages of briefing before the trial date, given the Court's vacation and trial schedules in February 2022, so be concise; and please do not file a dispositive motion if, as the Court believes to be likely, there is any genuine dispute of material fact. The Court declines at this time to reset the trial. It has been set for a long time, and it will be difficult to find a new 15-day block that is agreeable to all parties and counsel but will not be set over other parties' cases. However, the Court realizes that the pressure on the discovery, dispositive motions and trial dates that we are under is the result of the plaintiffs' belated decisions to amend to add the Jeffco and Aurora defendants to this case. The Court might reconsider the trial date, in whole or in part, depending upon the outcome of the mediation set with Judge Meyer during the week of January 17, 2022. The Court requests a status report no later than January 21, 2022. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/23/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #176 / 179 Request for In Camera Review of OIM Memos to by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. Defendants are directed to submit for in camera review the unredacted documents, the documents with the original redactions, and the documents with the modified redactions. Depending upon the volume, the Court might have to review a portion of the documents and draw reasonable inferences as to the appropriateness of the redactions. The Court will defer consideration of ECF No. #169 until this process is completed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/23/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #153 Amended Complaint (Agreed Motion to file Third Amended Complaint) by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed 3AC clean), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed 3AC redline))(Wang, Elizabeth)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Denver Defendants' ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint by David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Anthony E. Tak.(Jordan, Lindsay)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 City of Aurora's ANSWER to #153 Amended Complaint by Cory Budaj, City of Aurora, CO.(Evans, Isabelle)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Jeff Shrader. Jeff Shrader answer due 12/13/2021. (Klymkowsky, Rebecca)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County, Colorado by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor (Wang, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION between Fitouri Plaintiffs and Jefferson County Defendants by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 REPLY to Response to #169 MOTION for Order to Preclude Former Independent Monitor Nicholas E. Mitchell as a Witness for Plaintiffs and Office of Independent Monitor Interview Memos as Evidence filed by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Ringel, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #207 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 169 MOTION for Order to Preclude Former Independent Monitor Nicholas E. Mitchell as a Witness for Plaintiffs and Office of Independent Monitor Interview Memos as Evidence. The reply is now due by 11/15/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/10/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #169 MOTION for Order to Preclude Former Independent Monitor Nicholas E. Mitchell as a Witness for Plaintiffs and Office of Independent Monitor Interview Memos as Evidence by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Ringel, Andrew)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit F to #205 Response by Defendant City and County of Denver.. (Ringel, Andrew) Modified on 11/5/2021 to add document title and linkage. (sphil, ).
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COURTS ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RECONSIDER IN CAMERA REVIEW OF OIM MEMOS PURSUANT TO THE by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defs Amended 5th Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit B - 10-14-21 Email Chain, #3 Exhibit C - 10-19-21 Ringel Letter, #4 Exhibit D - 10-21-21 Wang Letter, #5 Exhibit E - 10-22-21 Hoffman Email)(Ringel, Andrew)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ANSWER to #178 Amended Complaint, by City and County of Denver.(Birkholz, Hollie)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER denying #201 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #178 Amended Complaint. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/1/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 REPLY to Response to #194 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #46 Scheduling Order and Trial Date filed by Defendants David Abeyta, Board of County Commissioners for Jefferson County Colorado, Cory Budaj, Jonathan Christian, City and County of Denver, City of Aurora, CO, Jeff Shrader, Keith Valentine, Consol Defendant Anthony E. Tak. (Birkholz, Hollie)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #178 Amended Complaint, by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Hoffman, Katherine)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 BRIEF in Opposition to #194 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #46 Scheduling Order and Trial Date filed by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Wang, Elizabeth)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 RESPONSE to #169 MOTION for Order to Preclude Former Independent Monitor Nicholas E. Mitchell as a Witness for Plaintiffs and Office of Independent Monitor Interview Memos as Evidence filed by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Anderson, Robert)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zach Packard, Stanford Smith, Maya Rothlein, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Amanda Blasingame. Jonathan Christian waiver sent on 10/27/2021, answer due 12/26/2021. (Macdonald, Timothy)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zach Packard, Stanford Smith, Maya Rothlein, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Amanda Blasingame. Keith Valentine waiver sent on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/25/2021. (Macdonald, Timothy)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE ORDER re: #194 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #46 Scheduling Order and Trial Date. The Court requests that plaintiffs promptly respond to defendants' motion at ECF No. 194. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/27/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Exhibits in Support of #194 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #46 Scheduling Order and Trial Date by Defendants David Abeyta, Board of County Commissioners for Jefferson County Colorado, Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, Jonathan Christian, City and County of Denver, City of Aurora, CO, Keith Valentine, Consol Defendant Anthony E. Tak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex B to Motion to Modify Scheduling Order)(Birkholz, Hollie)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #46 Scheduling Order and Trial Date by Defendants David Abeyta, Board of County Commissioners for Jefferson County Colorado, Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, Jonathan Christian, City and County of Denver, City of Aurora, CO, Jeff Shrader, Keith Valentine, Consol Defendant Anthony E. Tak. (Birkholz, Hollie)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #181 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures. The Court grants the motion for an extension with respect to expert Steven Ijames only, based on the medical issues described as to him. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/25/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zach Packard, Stanford Smith, Maya Rothlein, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Amanda Blasingame. Patricio Serrant waiver sent on 10/21/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Macdonald, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zach Packard, Stanford Smith, Maya Rothlein, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Amanda Blasingame. Matthew Brukbacher waiver sent on 10/21/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Macdonald, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zach Packard, Stanford Smith, Maya Rothlein, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Amanda Blasingame. David McNamee waiver sent on 10/21/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Macdonald, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zach Packard, Stanford Smith, Maya Rothlein, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Amanda Blasingame. City of Aurora, CO waiver sent on 10/20/2021, answer due 12/19/2021. (Macdonald, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isabelle Sabra Evans on behalf of Matthew Brukbacher, City of Aurora, CO, David McNamee, Patricio SerrantAttorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party Matthew Brukbacher(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party David McNamee(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party Patricio Serrant(pty:dft) (Evans, Isabelle)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter Ruben Morales on behalf of Matthew Brukbacher, City of Aurora, CO, David McNamee, Patricio SerrantAttorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Matthew Brukbacher(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party David McNamee(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Patricio Serrant(pty:dft) (Morales, Peter)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Turner Lowe on behalf of Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, David McNamee, Patricio SerrantAttorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Matthew Brukbacher(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Cory Budaj(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party David McNamee(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Patricio Serrant(pty:dft) (Lowe, Michael)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Goddard on behalf of Matthew Brukbacher, Cory Budaj, David McNamee, Patricio SerrantAttorney David M. Goddard added to party Matthew Brukbacher(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Goddard added to party Cory Budaj(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Goddard added to party David McNamee(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Goddard added to party Patricio Serrant(pty:dft) (Goddard, David)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 RESPONSE to #181 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures Epps Plaintiffs' Statement Regarding Denver Defendants' Third Motion for Extension of Time For Expert Disclosures filed by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Macdonald, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 REPLY to Response to #181 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures filed by Defendants David Abeyta, Jonathan Christian, City and County of Denver, Keith Valentine, Consol Defendant Anthony E. Tak. (Birkholz, Hollie)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 BRIEF in Opposition to #181 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures filed by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Claire Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (letter))(Wang, Elizabeth)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures by Defendants David Abeyta, Jonathan Christian, City and County of Denver, Keith Valentine, Consol Defendant Anthony E. Tak. (Birkholz, Hollie)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 SUMMONS REQUEST against Matthew Brukbacher, City of Aurora, CO, David McNamee, Patricio Serrant, filed by Zach Packard, Stanford Smith, Maya Rothlein, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Amanda Blasingame. (Attachments: #1 Summons to David McNamee, #2 Summons to Matthew Brukbacher, #3 Summons to Patricio Serrant)(Macdonald, Timothy) Modified on 11/9/2021 This is not an Amended Complaint. (sphil, ).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Jonathan Christian, Keith Valentine, David McNamee, Patricio Serrant, Matthew Brukbacher, John and Jane Does 1-100, John and Jane Boes 1-50, filed by Zach Packard, Stanford Smith, Maya Rothlein, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Amanda Blasingame.(Macdonald, Timothy)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Intent to Respond to Plaintiffs' Request for in Camera Review of Memos Pursuant to the Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider by Defendant City and County of Denver (Ringel, Andrew)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Request for In Camera Review of OIM Memos to by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #176 filed on 10/15/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Macdonald, Timothy)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Telephone Discovery Hearing held on 10/14/2021. Court Reporter: Julie Thomas. (jdyne, )
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #145 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint. Rule 15(a)(2). The Court has reviewed the motion, response and reply. The Court does not find evidence of unfair prejudice. The Court does not believe that the March 7, 2022 trial date should be threatened by the amendment since there are still approximately five months before trial. However, the parties will need to cooperate and accommodate the new defendants' discovery needs if they wish to keep their trial date. The Court requests that the plaintiffs file a clean version of the First Amended Complaint. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/13/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 LETTER re: 164 Minute Order, statement of issues for telephonic discovery dispute hearing on 10/14/21 by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Wang, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REPLY to Response to #145 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Macdonald, Timothy)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender on behalf of Board of County Commissioners for Jefferson County Colorado, Jeff ShraderAttorney Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender added to party Board of County Commissioners for Jefferson County Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender added to party Jeff Shrader(pty:dft) (Bender, Rachel)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Philana Klymkowsky on behalf of Board of County Commissioners for Jefferson County Colorado, Jeff ShraderAttorney Rebecca Philana Klymkowsky added to party Board of County Commissioners for Jefferson County Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Philana Klymkowsky added to party Jeff Shrader(pty:dft) (Klymkowsky, Rebecca)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION for Order to Preclude Former Independent Monitor Nicholas E. Mitchell as a Witness for Plaintiffs and Office of Independent Monitor Interview Memos as Evidence by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mitchell Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Formal Ethics Opinion 69)(Ringel, Andrew)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andy Sannier, Youssef Amghar, Sara Fitouri, Kelsey Taylor, Jacquelyn Parkins, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran. Cory Budaj waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/20/2021; City of Aurora, CO waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Waiver of Service of Summons for Cory Budaj - executed)(Wang, Elizabeth)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andy Sannier, Youssef Amghar, Sara Fitouri, Kelsey Taylor, Jacquelyn Parkins, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran. Board of County Commissioners for Jefferson County Colorado waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/20/2021; Jeff Shrader waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Waiver of Service for Shrader - executed)(Wang, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter Ruben Morales on behalf of Cory Budaj, City of Aurora, COAttorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Cory Budaj(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party City of Aurora, CO(pty:dft) (Morales, Peter)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isabelle Sabra Evans on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party City of Aurora, CO(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party Cory Budaj(pty:dft) (Evans, Isabelle)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MINUTE ORDER: A Telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 10/14/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. The Court directs that the parties use dial-in number 1-888-204-5984 and enter access code 7557338# when prompted. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/5/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #162 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures. Case deadlines are extended as follows: Designation of Affirmative Experts due 10/22/2021 and Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 11/23/2021 By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/4/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures by Defendant City and County of Denver, Consol Defendants Paul Pazen, Anthony E. Tak. (Ringel, Andrew)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #160 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #153 Amended. Defendants City and County of Denver and Anthony E. Tak answer is now due by 11/22/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/29/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #153 Amended Complaint by Defendant City and County of Denver, Consol Defendant Anthony E. Tak. (Hoffman, Katherine)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RESPONSE to #145 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint,,,, IN PARTIAL OPPOSITION filed by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Ringel, Andrew)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STATUS REPORT Regarding Class Certification Notice by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wang, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SUMMONES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, )
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Patrick Phelan, Matthew Canino, James Williams, Thomas Pine, Vincent Porter, Michael O'Donnell, Kevin Carroll, Rick Beall, David Abeyta, Marco Martinez, Justin Dodge, Richard Eberharter, Tana Cunningham, John Sampson, City of Aurora, Cory Budaj, JeffCo Board of County Commissioners, Jeff Shrader by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Matthew Canino, #2 Summons to James Williams, #3 Summons to Thomas Pine, #4 Summons to Vincent Porter, #5 Summons to Michael O'Donnell, #6 Summons to Kevin Carroll, #7 Summons to Rick Beall, #8 Summons to David Abeyta, #9 Summons to Marco Martinez, #10 Summons to Justin Dodge, #11 Summons to Richard Eberharter, #12 Summons to Tana Cunningham, #13 Summons to John Sampson, #14 Summons to City of Aurora, #15 Summons to Cory Budaj, #16 Summons to JeffCo Board of Cnty Commissioners, #17 Summons to Jeff Shrader)(Wang, Elizabeth)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #154 Summons Request, filed by attorney Elizabeth Wang. The summons will not be issued due to an incomplete case caption. The caption must list all plaintiffs and defendants; "et al." cannot substitute the listing of all parties named in the case. Action to Take - Please Re-file a completed summons listing each party in the case caption per Fed Civ. Rule 4. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Patrick Phalen, Matthew Canino, James Williams, Thomas Pine, Vincent Porter, Michaell O'Donnell, Kevin Carroll, Rick Beall, David Abeyta, Marco Martinez, Justin Dodge, Richard Eberharter, Tana Cunningham, John Sampson, City of Aurora, Cory Budaj, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Jeff Shrader by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Matthew Canino, #2 Summons to James D. Williams, #3 Summons to Thomas Pine, #4 Summons to Vincent Porter, #5 Summons to Michael O'Donnell, #6 Summons to Kevin Carroll, #7 Summons to Rick Beall, #8 Summons to David Abeyta, #9 Summons to Marco Martinez, #10 Summons to Justin Dodge, #11 Summons to Richard Eberharter, #12 Summons to Tana Cunningham, #13 Summons to John Sampson, #14 Summons to City of Aurora, #15 Summons to Cory Budaj, #16 Summons to JeffCo Board of Cnty Commissioners, #17 Summons to Jeff Shrader)(Wang, Elizabeth)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 SECOND AMENDED Class Action COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Anthony E. Tak, et al, filed by Sara Fitouri, et al. (document filed in this case pursuant to [#152] Order). (sphil, ) Modified on 9/15/2021 to edit text. (sphil, ).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #142 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify. The Court requests that the Clerk of Court's Office docket the Second Amended Complaint at ECF No. 142-2. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/15/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER finding as moot #140 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/15/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #135 / 136 MOTION for Reconsideration. The Court suggests that defense counsel reexamine the memos to be sure that factual information was not redacted, i.e., that only thoughts and mental impressions from the interviews were redacted. If counsel has done so, and represents that the memos have been reexamined and that the redactions have been revised, if necessary; and if plaintiffs' counsel essentially does not trust their representations; then defendant may submit the memos for in camera inspection. The Court expects complete candor on both sides. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/15/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Exhibits in Support of #148 Response to Motion, by Defendant City and County of Denver, Consol Defendants Paul Pazen, Anthony E. Tak. (Birkholz, Hollie)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 RESPONSE to #142 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #140 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant City and County of Denver, Consol Defendants Paul Pazen, Anthony E. Tak. (Birkholz, Hollie)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Plaintiffs' REPLY in Support to [135, 136] MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff Amanda Blasingame, et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document 146 filed on 9/7/2021) (sphil, )
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Macdonald, Timothy)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Maya Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Macdonald, Timothy)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines, Expert Discovery Cut-Off and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. However, the Court informs the parties that a dispositive motion filed on December 29, 2022, that is fully briefed, provides the Court little time to consider it before March 7, 2022 trial date and, as a practical matter, means that the motion will, at best, have to be granted or denied without an extensive analysis or order. If there is any genuinely disputed issue of material fact, the motion will be denied. Please do not waste your time and resources, or the Court's if there is any such issue. Case deadlines are extended as follows: Affirmative Experts due 10/8/2021; Discovery due by 12/8/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 12/29/2021; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 11/8/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/31/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines, Expert Discovery Cut-Off and Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Defendants David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Daniel Felkins, Consol Defendant Paul Pazen. (Hoffman, Katherine)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #140 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed 2AC redline), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed 2AC clean), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18)(Wang, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 RESPONSE to 136 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Defendant City and County of Denver, Consol Defendants Paul Pazen, Anthony E. Tak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mitchell Depo Excerpts)(Ringel, Andrew)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Wang, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #137 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 136 MOTION for Reconsideration. The response is now due by 8/24/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/17/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #134 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Case Caption. The Court requests that the Clerk of Court amend the caption to reflect plaintiff Rothlein's name change. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/17/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 136 MOTION for Reconsideration by Defendants David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Daniel Felkins, Consol Defendant Paul Pazen. (Ringel, Andrew)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Reconsider Discovery Order by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #135 filed on 7/27/2021). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Phillip Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Macdonald, Timothy)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Case Caption by Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Phillip Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Macdonald, Timothy)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER: The Court approves of the parties' proposed joint notice to class members. See attached. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Approved Notice to Class) (rbjsec. )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine Hoffman on behalf of David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Daniel Felkins, J. LNU, Paul Pazen, Anthony E. TakAttorney Katherine Hoffman added to party David Abeyta(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine Hoffman added to party City and County of Denver(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine Hoffman added to party Daniel Felkins(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine Hoffman added to party J. LNU(pty:condft), Attorney Katherine Hoffman added to party Paul Pazen(pty:condft), Attorney Katherine Hoffman added to party Anthony E. Tak(pty:condft) (Hoffman, Katherine)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Extension of Time. Case deadlines are extended as follows: Plaintiffs' expert deadline is 8/2/2021; defendants' experts deadline is 9/2/2021; plaintiffs' rebuttal experts due 9/23/2021; expert discovery deadline is 10/22/2021; fact discovery deadline is 10/4/2021. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/9/21. Text Only Entry(jdyne, )
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose Expert Reports and Complete Discovery by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor, Plaintiffs Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Phillip Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Wang, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #108 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiffs Black Lives Matter 5280 and Apryl Alexander and Amend Case Caption. The Court requests that the Clerk of Court's Office amend the case caption accordingly. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/28/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #107 MOTION for Order to Sever and Deconsolidate Plaintiff Michael Acker's Case Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 21 and 42. Plaintiff Aker's claims are deconsolidated and no longer part of the lead case 1:20-cv-01878-RBJ. The Court directs that all future pleadings related to the Acker case be filed into case 1:20-cv-03155-RBJ. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/28/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #91 Motion to Certify Class by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/28/21.(jdyne, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER: The parties have notified Chambers via email that they have resolved their discovery dispute. The telephonic discovery conference set tomorrow 6/29/2021 is vacated. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/28/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 REPLY to Response to #107 MOTION for Order to Sever and Deconsolidate Plaintiff Michael Acker's Case Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 21 and 42 filed by Consol Plaintiff Michael Acker. (McNulty, Andrew)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY re #123 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Motion Hearing held via video conference on 6/25/2021. Amended to correct date of hearing, as indicated. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Motion Hearing held via video conference on 6/25/2021. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE re #91 MOTION to Certify Class (Supplemental Exhibit 115 to Motion to Certify Class) by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 115)(Wang, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mindy Amanda Gorin on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Mindy Amanda Gorin added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Mindy Amanda Gorin added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Mindy Amanda Gorin added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Mindy Amanda Gorin added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Mindy Amanda Gorin added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Mindy Amanda Gorin added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Mindy Amanda Gorin added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Mindy Amanda Gorin added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Mindy Amanda Gorin added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Gorin, Mindy)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER: A Telephonic Discovery Hearing is set for 6/29/2021 at 8:30 AM before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. The Court directs that the parties use dial-in number 1-888-204-5984 and enter access code 7557338# when prompted. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/21/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE to #107 MOTION for Order to Sever and Deconsolidate Plaintiff Michael Acker's Case Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 21 and 42 filed by Defendants David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Daniel Felkins, Consol Defendant Paul Pazen. (Jordan, Lindsay)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 Flash Drive containing Exhibit 112 to #117 Reply to Response to Motion by Consol Plaintiff Youssef Amghar. Placed in box A-1-1 located in the oversized area of the clerk's office. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REPLY to Response to #91 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Ex. 108, #3 Exhibit Ex. 109, #4 Exhibit Ex. 110, #5 Exhibit Ex. 111, #6 Exhibit Ex. 112 Cover Page, #7 Exhibit Ex. 113, #8 Exhibit Ex. 114)(Rutahindurwa, Makeba)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #115 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/8/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Rutahindurwa, Makeba)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andreas E. Moffett on behalf of Apryl Alexander, Black Lives Matter 5280, Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Phillip Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee WedgeworthAttorney Andreas E. Moffett added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Andreas E. Moffett added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Andreas E. Moffett added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Andreas E. Moffett added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Andreas E. Moffett added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Andreas E. Moffett added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Andreas E. Moffett added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Andreas E. Moffett added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Andreas E. Moffett added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Moffett, Andreas)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RESPONSE to #91 MOTION to Certify Class as Amended filed by Defendants David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Daniel Felkins, Consol Defendants Paul Pazen, Anthony E. Tak. (Jordan, Lindsay)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 RESPONSE to #91 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendants David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Daniel Felkins, Consol Defendants Paul Pazen, Anthony E. Tak. (Jordan, Lindsay)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #109 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/25/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec, )
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Discovery Conference held on May 20, 2021 before Judge Jackson. Pages: 1-24. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (smitc, )
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Daniel Felkins, Consol Defendants Paul Pazen, Anthony E. Tak. (Jordan, Lindsay)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiffs Black Lives Matter 5280 and Apryl Alexander and Amend Case Caption by Plaintiffs Apryl Alexander, Black Lives Matter 5280, Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Phillip Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Macdonald, Timothy)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for Order to Sever and Deconsolidate Plaintiff Michael Acker's Case Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 21 and 42 by Consol Plaintiff Michael Acker. (McNulty, Andrew)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: TelephoneDiscovery Hearing held on 5/20/2021. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 LETTER re: 103 Minute Order, issues for 5/20/21 discovery hearing by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER: The Hearing on Motion for Class Certification set for 5/26/2021 has been RESET for 6/25/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. The hearing will be held by video teleconference. The Court's staff will provide connection instructions to the parties by email prior to the hearing. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/19/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER: A Telephonic Discovery Hearing is set for 5/20/2021 at 8:30 AM before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. The Court directs that the parties use dial-in number 1-888-204-5984 and enter access code 7557338# when prompted. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/17/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose Expert Reports. Case deadlines are extended as follows: Plaintiffs' expert deadline is 7/12/2021; defendants' experts deadline is 8/12/2021; plaintiffs' rebuttal experts due 9/2/2021; the 9/2/2021 discovery cutoff is converted into the fact discovery cutoff; expert discovery deadline is 10/3/2021; and the dispositive motions deadline is extended to 11/15/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/11/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose Expert Reports by Plaintiffs Apryl Alexander, Black Lives Matter 5280, Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Phillip Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Francesca Lawrence, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Macdonald, Timothy)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gerardo Mijares-Shafai on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Mijares-Shafai, Gerardo)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Leslie Claire Bailey on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Leslie Claire Bailey added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Leslie Claire Bailey added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Leslie Claire Bailey added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Leslie Claire Bailey added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Leslie Claire Bailey added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Leslie Claire Bailey added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Leslie Claire Bailey added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Leslie Claire Bailey added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Leslie Claire Bailey added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Leslie Claire Bailey added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Bailey, Leslie)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael J. Sebba on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael J. Sebba added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J. Sebba added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J. Sebba added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J. Sebba added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J. Sebba added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J. Sebba added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J. Sebba added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J. Sebba added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J. Sebba added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J. Sebba added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Sebba, Michael)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mollie DiBrell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Mollie DiBrell added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie DiBrell added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie DiBrell added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie DiBrell added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie DiBrell added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie DiBrell added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie DiBrell added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie DiBrell added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie DiBrell added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie DiBrell added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (DiBrell, Mollie)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lindsay Michelle Jordan on behalf of David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Daniel Felkins, Paul Pazen, Anthony E. TakAttorney Lindsay Michelle Jordan added to party David Abeyta(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay Michelle Jordan added to party City and County of Denver(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay Michelle Jordan added to party Daniel Felkins(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay Michelle Jordan added to party Paul Pazen(pty:condft), Attorney Lindsay Michelle Jordan added to party Anthony E. Tak(pty:condft) (Jordan, Lindsay)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit 100 to #91 by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 101, #2 Exhibit 102)(Rutahindurwa, Makeba) Modified to add title on 4/29/2021 (rvill, ).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Conventionally Submitted Material : One Hard Drive containing exhibits to #91 MOTION to Certify Class, by Consol Plaintiff Sara Fitouri. Material placed in box A-1-1 located in the oversized area of the clerk's office. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #90 Motion for LeaveMOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits 100-102 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/27/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Exhibits in Support of #91 MOTION to Certify Class (Exhibit 106) by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION to Certify Class by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31 part 1, #33 Exhibit 31 part 2, #34 Exhibit 31 part 3, #35 Exhibit 31 part 4, #36 Exhibit 31 part 5, #37 Exhibit 31 part 6, #38 Exhibit 31 part 7, #39 Exhibit 31 part 8, #40 Exhibit 31 part 9, #41 Exhibit 31 part 10, #42 Exhibit 31 part 11, #43 Exhibit 31 part 12, #44 Exhibit 32, #45 Exhibit 33, #46 Exhibit 34, #47 Exhibit 35, #48 Exhibit 36, #49 Exhibit 37, #50 Exhibit 38, #51 Exhibit 39, #52 Exhibit 40, #53 Exhibit 41, #54 Exhibit 42, #55 Exhibit 43, #56 Exhibit 44, #57 Exhibit 45, #58 Exhibit 46, #59 Exhibit 47, #60 Exhibit 48, #61 Exhibit 49, #62 Exhibit 50, #63 Exhibit 51, #64 Exhibit 52, #65 Exhibit 53, #66 Exhibit 54, #67 Exhibit 55, #68 Exhibit 56, #69 Exhibit 57, #70 Exhibit 58, #71 Exhibit 59, #72 Exhibit 60, #73 Exhibit 61, #74 Exhibit 62, #75 Exhibit 63, #76 Exhibit 64, #77 Exhibit 65, #78 Exhibit 66, #79 Exhibit 67, #80 Exhibit 68, #81 Exhibit 69, #82 Exhibit 70, #83 Exhibit 71, #84 Exhibit 72, #85 Exhibit 73, #86 Exhibit 74, #87 Exhibit 75, #88 Exhibit 76, #89 Exhibit 77, #90 Exhibit 78, #91 Exhibit 79, #92 Exhibit 80, #93 Exhibit 81, #94 Exhibit 82, #95 Exhibit 83, #96 Exhibit 84, #97 Exhibit 85, #98 Exhibit 86, #99 Exhibit 87, #100 Exhibit 88, #101 Exhibit 89, #102 Exhibit 90, #103 Exhibit 91, #104 Exhibit 92, #105 Exhibit 93, #106 Exhibit 94, #107 Exhibit 95, #108 Exhibit 96, #109 Exhibit 97, #110 Exhibit 98, #111 Exhibit 99, #112 Exhibit 103, #113 Exhibit 104, #114 Exhibit 105, #115 Exhibit 107)(Rutahindurwa, Makeba)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits 100-102 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Rutahindurwa, Makeba)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #88 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/23/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting #73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson terminated by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on April 16, 2021.(rvill, )
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint by Paul Pazen.(Birkholz, Hollie)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint by Daniel Felkins.(Birkholz, Hollie)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint by City and County of Denver.(Birkholz, Hollie)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint by David Abeyta.(Birkholz, Hollie)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Daniel Moore Twetten was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (ebutl)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #80 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tara Elizabeth Thompson is withdrawn. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/9/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying #78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/7/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew David Ringel on behalf of David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Daniel Felkins, J. LNU, Paul Pazen, Anthony E. TakAttorney Andrew David Ringel added to party David Abeyta(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew David Ringel added to party City and County of Denver(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew David Ringel added to party Daniel Felkins(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew David Ringel added to party J. LNU(pty:condft), Attorney Andrew David Ringel added to party Paul Pazen(pty:condft), Attorney Andrew David Ringel added to party Anthony E. Tak(pty:condft) (Ringel, Andrew)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hollie Renee Birkholz on behalf of David Abeyta, Daniel FelkinsAttorney Hollie Renee Birkholz added to party David Abeyta(pty:dft), Attorney Hollie Renee Birkholz added to party Daniel Felkins(pty:dft) (Birkholz, Hollie)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Charles Huss on behalf of David Abeyta, Daniel FelkinsAttorney Robert Charles Huss added to party David Abeyta(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Daniel Felkins(pty:dft) (Huss, Robert)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Acker. David Abeyta waiver sent on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021; Daniel Felkins waiver sent on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service - Abeyta)(McNulty, Andrew)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Cindy Fisk Pursuant to D.C.Colo.AttyR 5(b) by Plaintiff Cidney Fisk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reidy, Patrick)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Telephone Discovery Hearing held on 3/8/2021. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 LETTER listing issues for March 8, 2021 telephonic discovery hearing by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER: A Telephonic Discovery Hearing is set for 3/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. The Court directs that the parties use dial-in number 1-888-204-5984 and enter access code 7557338# when prompted. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/23/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec, )
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Abeyta, City and County of Denver, Daniel Felkins, Paul Pazen, filed by Michael Acker.(rvill, )
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Consol Plaintiff Michael Acker. The Court requests that the Clerk of Court's Office docket the Amended Complaint at 67-1. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/16/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Consol Plaintiff Michael Acker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint (Clean), #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint (Redline))(McNulty, Andrew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for class certification. The Court requests that plaintiffs give considerable attention to whether class treatment is either necessary or feasible in this case. The deadline to file a motion for class certification is now 4/26/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/1/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Makeba Rutahindurwa on behalf of Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey TaylorAttorney Makeba Rutahindurwa added to party Youssef Amghar(pty:conpla), Attorney Makeba Rutahindurwa added to party Joe Deras(pty:conpla), Attorney Makeba Rutahindurwa added to party Johnathen Duran(pty:conpla), Attorney Makeba Rutahindurwa added to party Sara Fitouri(pty:conpla), Attorney Makeba Rutahindurwa added to party Jacquelyn Parkins(pty:conpla), Attorney Makeba Rutahindurwa added to party Andy Sannier(pty:conpla), Attorney Makeba Rutahindurwa added to party Kelsey Taylor(pty:conpla) (Rutahindurwa, Makeba)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for class certification by Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/4/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Birkholz, Hollie)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #58 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #46 Scheduling Order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/30/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anya Amalia Havriliak terminated. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/28/20. Text Only Entry(jdyne, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Anya Havriliak by Plaintiffs Apryl Alexander, Black Lives Matter 5280, Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Phillip Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Havriliak, Anya)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #46 Scheduling Order by Consol Plaintiff Michael Acker. (McNulty, Andrew)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint by Paul Pazen.(Birkholz, Hollie)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint by City and County of Denver.(Birkholz, Hollie)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick Conor Reidy on behalf of Apryl Alexander, Black Lives Matter 5280, Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Phillip Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee WedgeworthAttorney Patrick Conor Reidy added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Conor Reidy added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Conor Reidy added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Conor Reidy added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Conor Reidy added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Conor Reidy added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Conor Reidy added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Conor Reidy added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Conor Reidy added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Conor Reidy added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Reidy, Patrick)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 by Defendant City and County of Denver, Consol Defendants Paul Pazen, Anthony E. Tak. Attorney David Cooperstein is withdrawn. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/14/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw by Defendant City and County of Denver, Consol Defendants Paul Pazen, Anthony E. Tak. (Cooperstein, David)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Charles Huss on behalf of City and County of Denver, Paul Pazen, Anthony E. TakAttorney Robert Charles Huss added to party City and County of Denver(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Paul Pazen(pty:condft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Anthony E. Tak(pty:condft) (Huss, Robert)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hollie Renee Birkholz on behalf of City and County of Denver, Paul Pazen, Anthony E. TakAttorney Hollie Renee Birkholz added to party City and County of Denver(pty:dft), Attorney Hollie Renee Birkholz added to party Paul Pazen(pty:condft), Attorney Hollie Renee Birkholz added to party Anthony E. Tak(pty:condft) (Birkholz, Hollie)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Charles Cooperstein on behalf of Paul PazenAttorney David Charles Cooperstein added to party Paul Pazen(pty:condft) (Cooperstein, David)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER to Consolidate Related Actions. The Court sua sponte orders that related action Michael Acker v. City and County of Denver et al, 1:20-cv-03155-KLM be consolidated with the above captioned matter and that all future filings shall be made on the consolidated docket under the lead case Black Lives Matter 5280 et al v. City and County of Denver et al, 1:20-cv-01878-RBJ. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on October 28, 2020. (rvill, )
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Cooperstein, David)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Francesca Lawrence by Consol Defendants Kevin Beasley, Christopher Cochran, M. Davis, Zachary Moldenhauer, Andrew Nielsen, Chelsea Novotny, Jacob Vaporis, Defendant City and County of Denver, Consol Plaintiff Francesca Lawrence. (Wang, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/21/20. (jdyne, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint by Plaintiffs Apryl Alexander, Black Lives Matter 5280, Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Phillip Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth. (Macdonald, Timothy)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter is set for a 12-15 day Jury Trial to commence on March 7, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for February 4, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/4/2020. (rbjsec. )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference via Video Teleconference held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/3/2020. Motion for Class Certification shall be filed on or before March 26, 2021. A response shall be filed on or before April 26, 2021. A reply may be filed on or before May 10, 2021. Motion Hearing regarding Class Certification set for 5/26/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Fifteen day Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/4/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Discovery due by 9/3/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2021. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (ebuch)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED ORDER. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/3/2020. (apesa, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/3/2020
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Rule 502(d) Order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/3/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Rule 502(d) Order by Plaintiffs Apryl Alexander, Black Lives Matter 5280, Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Phillip Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Francesca Lawrence, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Protective Order), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed Rule 502(d) Order))(Wang, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Working Draft of Proposed Scheduling Order by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/2/2020. The Court has inserted multiple comments on the defendants' proposed scheduling order in Track Changes. The Word version will be emailed to counsel. Please see the attached pdf redlined version. The Court requests that the parties review this draft prior to tomorrow's scheduling conference. (rbjsec. )
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint by Kevin Beasley, City and County of Denver, Christopher Cochran, M. Davis, Paul Hogan, Heather R. Jossi, Zachary Moldenhauer, Andrew Nielsen, Chelsea Novotny, Anthony E. Tak.(Cooperstein, David)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Apryl Alexander, Black Lives Matter 5280, Amanda Blasingame, Elisabeth Epps, Cidney Fisk, Hollis Lyman, Zach Packard, Phillip Rothlein, Stanford Smith, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Consol Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Francesca Lawrence, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Proposed Scheduling Order by Consol Defendants Kevin Beasley, Christopher Cochran, M. Davis, Paul Hogan, Heather R. Jossi, Zachary Moldenhauer, Andrew Nielsen, Chelsea Novotny, Anthony E. Tak, Jacob Vaporis, Jacqueline A. Velasquez, Defendant City and County of Denver. (Cooperstein, David)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by City and County of Denver.(Cooperstein, David)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party without prejudice by Consol Plaintiff Ambrose Cruz (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francesca Lawrence, Kelsey Taylor, Andy Sannier, Joe Deras, Jacquelyn Parkins, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri. All Defendants. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: The consolidated matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the hearing will be held by video teleconference. The Court's staff will provide connection instructions to the parties by email prior to the hearing. In an attempt to avoid bandwidth issues, the Court requests that each plaintiff group (one for each case) and the defendant limit themselves to two connections per group. However, multiple attorneys may appear together through one connection. Counsel, parties, and the general public whom will not participate, but want to hear the proceedings may utilize the Court's telephonic conferencing system by dialing Toll Free: 888-204-5984 using Access Code: 7557338#. The Court requests that the parties submit a proposed joint Scheduling Order (or if they cannot agree, then two proposed Scheduling Orders), by 8/27/2020. Please file the proposed order(s) into ECF as well as email a Word version to jackson_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. The Scheduling Order should address two scenarios: one if the Court determines to proceed with class action briefing, which should include a short section of no more than two of the pages per side indicating why a class action is or is not appropriate; the other on the basis that the two cases will proceed on normal course without class action status. Indicate that injunctive relief beyond what was already stipulated and approved by the Court in Abay et al v. City and County of Denver, 1:20-cv-01616-RBJ, would be ordered only for exceptional reasons. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/5/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS. The Court sua sponte orders that related action Cruz et al v. City and County of Denver et al, 1:20-cv-01922-RBJ be consolidated with the above captioned matter and that all future filings shall be made on the consolidated docket under case Black Lives Matter 5280 et al v. City and County of Denver et al, 1:20-cv-01878-RBJ. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/4/2020. (apesa, )
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 17 Order this case is reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1878-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. After conferral pursuant to Local Civil Rule 3.2(d), and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 40.1(d)(4)(B) and the approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 1:20-cv-01878-RBJ. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/31/2020. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Charles Cooperstein on behalf of City and County of DenverAttorney David Charles Cooperstein added to party City and County of Denver(pty:dft) (Cooperstein, David)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillip Rothlein, Elisabeth Epps, Zach Packard, Cidney Fisk, Apryl Alexander, Hollis Lyman, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Black Lives Matter 5280, Stanford Smith, Amanda Blasingame. City and County of Denver waiver sent on 6/26/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Macdonald, Timothy) Modified to correct answer deadline on 6/30/2020 (cmadr, ).
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 29 June 2020. Consent Form due by 8/14/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due8/7/2020 Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colin Michael O'Brien on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Colin Michael O'Brien added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Colin Michael O'Brien added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Colin Michael O'Brien added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Colin Michael O'Brien added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Colin Michael O'Brien added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Colin Michael O'Brien added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Colin Michael O'Brien added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Colin Michael O'Brien added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Colin Michael O'Brien added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Colin Michael O'Brien added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (O'Brien, Colin)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anya Amalia Havriliak on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Anya Amalia Havriliak added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Anya Amalia Havriliak added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Anya Amalia Havriliak added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Anya Amalia Havriliak added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Anya Amalia Havriliak added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Anya Amalia Havriliak added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Anya Amalia Havriliak added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Anya Amalia Havriliak added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Anya Amalia Havriliak added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Anya Amalia Havriliak added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Havriliak, Anya)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Edwin Packard Aro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Edwin Packard Aro added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Edwin Packard Aro added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Edwin Packard Aro added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Edwin Packard Aro added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Edwin Packard Aro added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Edwin Packard Aro added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Edwin Packard Aro added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Edwin Packard Aro added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Edwin Packard Aro added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Edwin Packard Aro added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Aro, Edwin)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Reeves Anderson on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Reeves Anderson added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Anderson, Robert)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew J. Douglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Douglas, Matthew)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Arielle K. Herzberg by Arielle Kay Herzberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Arielle Kay Herzberg added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Arielle Kay Herzberg added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Arielle Kay Herzberg added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Arielle Kay Herzberg added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Arielle Kay Herzberg added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Arielle Kay Herzberg added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Arielle Kay Herzberg added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Arielle Kay Herzberg added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Arielle Kay Herzberg added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Arielle Kay Herzberg added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Herzberg, Arielle)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Sara R. Neel by Sara R. Neel on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Neel, Sara)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Mark Silverstein by Mark Silverstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla) (Silverstein, Mark)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Timothy R. Macdonald on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Macdonald, Timothy)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Macdonald, Timothy)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7357861)Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party Apryl Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party Black Lives Matter 5280(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party Amanda Blasingame(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party Elisabeth Epps(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party Cidney Fisk(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party Hollis Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party Zach Packard(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party Phillip Rothlein(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party Stanford Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy R. Macdonald added to party Ashlee Wedgeworth(pty:pla), filed by Phillip Rothlein, Elisabeth Epps, Zach Packard, Cidney Fisk, Apryl Alexander, Hollis Lyman, Ashlee Wedgeworth, Black Lives Matter 5280, Stanford Smith, Amanda Blasingame. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Macdonald, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epps et al v. City and County of Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Blasingame
Represented By: Arielle Kay Herzberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Anya Amalia Havriliak
Represented By: Colin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Andreas E. Moffett
Represented By: Brian Mark Williams
Represented By: Diana K. Sterk
Represented By: Gerardo Mijares-Shafai
Represented By: Leslie Claire Bailey
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Represented By: Mindy Amanda Gorin
Represented By: Mollie DiBrell
Represented By: Patrick Conor Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apryl Alexander
Represented By: Arielle Kay Herzberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Anya Amalia Havriliak
Represented By: Colin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Andreas E. Moffett
Represented By: Gerardo Mijares-Shafai
Represented By: Leslie Claire Bailey
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Represented By: Mindy Amanda Gorin
Represented By: Mollie DiBrell
Represented By: Patrick Conor Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlee Wedgeworth
Represented By: Arielle Kay Herzberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Anya Amalia Havriliak
Represented By: Colin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Andreas E. Moffett
Represented By: Brian Mark Williams
Represented By: Diana K. Sterk
Represented By: Gerardo Mijares-Shafai
Represented By: Leslie Claire Bailey
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Represented By: Mindy Amanda Gorin
Represented By: Mollie DiBrell
Represented By: Patrick Conor Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Packard
Represented By: Arielle Kay Herzberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Anya Amalia Havriliak
Represented By: Colin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Andreas E. Moffett
Represented By: Brian Mark Williams
Represented By: Diana K. Sterk
Represented By: Gerardo Mijares-Shafai
Represented By: Leslie Claire Bailey
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Represented By: Mindy Amanda Gorin
Represented By: Mollie DiBrell
Represented By: Patrick Conor Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Epps
Represented By: Arielle Kay Herzberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Anya Amalia Havriliak
Represented By: Colin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Andreas E. Moffett
Represented By: Brian Mark Williams
Represented By: Diana K. Sterk
Represented By: Gerardo Mijares-Shafai
Represented By: Leslie Claire Bailey
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Represented By: Mindy Amanda Gorin
Represented By: Mollie DiBrell
Represented By: Patrick Conor Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Smith
Represented By: Arielle Kay Herzberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Anya Amalia Havriliak
Represented By: Colin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Andreas E. Moffett
Represented By: Brian Mark Williams
Represented By: Diana K. Sterk
Represented By: Gerardo Mijares-Shafai
Represented By: Leslie Claire Bailey
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Represented By: Mindy Amanda Gorin
Represented By: Mollie DiBrell
Represented By: Patrick Conor Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cidney Fisk
Represented By: Arielle Kay Herzberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Anya Amalia Havriliak
Represented By: Colin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Gerardo Mijares-Shafai
Represented By: Leslie Claire Bailey
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Represented By: Mollie DiBrell
Represented By: Patrick Conor Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Lives Matter 5280
Represented By: Arielle Kay Herzberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Anya Amalia Havriliak
Represented By: Colin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Andreas E. Moffett
Represented By: Gerardo Mijares-Shafai
Represented By: Leslie Claire Bailey
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Represented By: Mindy Amanda Gorin
Represented By: Mollie DiBrell
Represented By: Patrick Conor Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollis Lyman
Represented By: Arielle Kay Herzberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Anya Amalia Havriliak
Represented By: Colin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Andreas E. Moffett
Represented By: Brian Mark Williams
Represented By: Diana K. Sterk
Represented By: Gerardo Mijares-Shafai
Represented By: Leslie Claire Bailey
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Represented By: Mindy Amanda Gorin
Represented By: Mollie DiBrell
Represented By: Patrick Conor Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Rothlein
Represented By: Arielle Kay Herzberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Anya Amalia Havriliak
Represented By: Colin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maya Rothlein
Represented By: Andreas E. Moffett
Represented By: Anya Amalia Havriliak
Represented By: Arielle Kay Herzberg
Represented By: Brian Mark Williams
Represented By: Colin Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Diana K. Sterk
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Represented By: Gerardo Mijares-Shafai
Represented By: Leslie Claire Bailey
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Represented By: Mindy Amanda Gorin
Represented By: Mollie DiBrell
Represented By: Patrick Conor Reidy
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Represented By: Hollie Renee Birkholz
Represented By: Katherine Hoffman
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Jordan
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Represented By: Robert Alan Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Abeyta
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Represented By: Hollie Renee Birkholz
Represented By: Katherine Hoffman
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Jordan
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Represented By: Robert Alan Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora, CO
Represented By: Isabelle Sabra Evans
Represented By: Peter Ruben Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cory Budaj
Represented By: David M. Goddard
Represented By: Heather Dawn Kuhlman
Represented By: Isabelle Sabra Evans
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Peter Ruben Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for Jefferson County Colorado
Represented By: Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender
Represented By: Rebecca Philana Klymkowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Shrader
Represented By: Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender
Represented By: Rebecca Philana Klymkowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Christian
Represented By: Hollie Renee Birkholz
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Valentine
Represented By: Hollie Renee Birkholz
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McNamee
Represented By: David M. Goddard
Represented By: Heather Dawn Kuhlman
Represented By: Isabelle Sabra Evans
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Peter Ruben Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricio Serrant
Represented By: David M. Goddard
Represented By: Heather Dawn Kuhlman
Represented By: Isabelle Sabra Evans
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Peter Ruben Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Brukbacher
Represented By: David M. Goddard
Represented By: Heather Dawn Kuhlman
Represented By: Isabelle Sabra Evans
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Peter Ruben Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Boes 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dreith
Represented By: Eric Thomas Butler
Represented By: Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Hamilton
Represented By: Eric Thomas Butler
Represented By: Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Canino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Kevin Beasley
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Heather R. Jossi
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Chelsea Novotny
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Zachary Moldenhauer
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Jacqueline A. Velasquez
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Anthony E. Tak
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Represented By: Hollie Renee Birkholz
Represented By: Katherine Hoffman
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Jordan
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Andrew Nielsen
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: J. LNU
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Represented By: Katherine Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Paul Hogan
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: M. Davis
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Christopher Cochran
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Jacob Vaporis
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Paul Pazen
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Represented By: Hollie Renee Birkholz
Represented By: Katherine Hoffman
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Jordan
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Daniel Felkins
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Represented By: Hollie Renee Birkholz
Represented By: Katherine Hoffman
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Jordan
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: City and County of Denver, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: James D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Thomas Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Vincent Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Michael O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Kevin Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Rick Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Marco Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Justin Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Richard D. Eberharter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Tana Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: City of Aurora, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ambrose Cruz
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jacquelyn Parkins
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Makeba Rutahindurwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Andy Sannier
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Makeba Rutahindurwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Youssef Amghar
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Makeba Rutahindurwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Johnathen Duran
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Makeba Rutahindurwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kelsey Taylor
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Makeba Rutahindurwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joe Deras
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Makeba Rutahindurwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sara Fitouri
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Makeba Rutahindurwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Francesca Lawrence
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Makeba Rutahindurwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Acker
Represented By: Andrew Joseph McNulty
Represented By: Reid Robertson Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Claire Sannier
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Makeba Rutahindurwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Baumgartner Law, LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Beem & Isley, PC
Represented By: Stephen B. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?