Young v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Melanie H Young
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01888
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service by Plaintiff Melanie H Young. (Arckey, Thomas)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melanie H Young. Transamerica Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Arckey, Thomas)
August 8, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Transamerica Life Insurance Company, filed by Melanie H Young.(Arckey, Thomas)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Abigail S. Wallach on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance CompanyAttorney Abigail S. Wallach added to party Transamerica Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wallach, Abigail)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Commonwealth General Corporation, Corporate Parent Transamerica Corporation, Other Affiliate The AEGON Trust, Other Affiliate Aegon International B.V., Other Affiliate AEGON N.V. for Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Trim, Roger)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Roger Glenn Trim on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance CompanyAttorney Roger Glenn Trim added to party Transamerica Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Trim, Roger)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/21/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/14/2020, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3-1] is September 8, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/2/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (jtorr, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for a Jury Trial against Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7359646)Attorney Thomas J. Arckey added to party Melanie H Young(pty:pla), filed by Melanie H Young. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Arckey, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie H Young
Represented By: Thomas J. Arckey
Represented By: Corey William Knoebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Abigail S. Wallach
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?