Ledezma v. Young Life
Plaintiff: Laureana Ledezma
Defendant: Young Life
Case Number: 1:2020cv01896
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Young Life. (Neilio, Kimberley)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 the Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Initial Disclosures. The Parties may exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(c) on or before September 11, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/12/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Exchange Initial Disclosures by Plaintiff Laureana Ledezma. (Giarratana, Ellen)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Young Life. Young Life waiver sent on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Neilio, Kimberley)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #7 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/9/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kimberley D. Neilio on behalf of Young LifeAttorney Kimberley D. Neilio added to party Young Life(pty:dft) (Neilio, Kimberley)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the court on #7 the Consent/Non-consent form filed by the Parties on July 7, 2020. Although attorney Kimberley Dempster Neilio signed the Form on behalf of Defendant, she has not yet entered an appearance in this matter. Therefore, in order for the court to effectuate the Parties's consent as indicated in #7 , IT IS ORDERED attorney Kimberley Dempster Neilio enter an appearance in this matter on or before July 13, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/8/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Laureana Ledezma All parties consent.. (Giarratana, Ellen)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/29/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 8/12/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/19/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/26/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Iris Halpern on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Iris Halpern added to party Laureana Ledezma(pty:pla) (Halpern, Iris)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee: $400, receipt number COX095559. (trvo, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Young Life (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Ellen Kathleen Giarratana added to party Laureana Ledezma(pty:pla), filed by Laureana Ledezma. (Attachments: #1 Summons 1-Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 2-Civil Cover Sheet)(Giarratana, Ellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledezma v. Young Life
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Life
Represented By: Kimberley D. Neilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laureana Ledezma
Represented By: Ellen Kathleen Giarratana
Represented By: Iris Halpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?