Cruz et al v. City and County of Denver et al
Plaintiff: Andy Sannier, Jacquelyn Parkins, Kelsey Taylor, Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Francesca Lawrence, Sara Fitouri, Joe Deras and Johnathen Duran
Defendant: City and County of Denver, Colorado, Kevin Beasley, Heather R. Jossi, M. Davis, Jacqueline A. Velasquez, Christopher Cochran, Zachary Moldenhauer, Paul Hogan, Jacob Vaporis, J. LNU, Anthony E. Tak, Chelsea Novotny and Andrew Nielsen
Case Number: 1:2020cv01922
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for class certification. All filings are directed to be filed in the lead case 1:20-cv-01878-RBJ. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/1/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
January 29, 2021 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for class certification by Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5 August 2020. In light of Judge R. Brooke Jackson's order consolidating related actions (ECF #22 ), the Scheduling Conference currently set before this Court on September 9, 2020 is vacated. (cmadr, )
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS. The Court sua sponte orders that related action Cruz et al v. City and County of Denver et al, 1:20-cv-01922-RBJ be consolidated with the above captioned matter and that all future filings shall be made on the consolidated docket under case Black Lives Matter 5280 et al v. City and County of Denver et al, 1:20-cv-01878-RBJ. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/4/2020. (apesa, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant City and County of Denver, Colorado. City and County of Denver, Colorado answer due 8/27/2020. (Cooperstein, David)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. After conferral pursuant to Local Civil Rule 3.2(d), and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 40.1(d)(4)(B) and the approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 1:20-cv-01922-RBJ-MEH. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 07/28/2020. Text Only Entry (athom, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Joe Deras, Johnathen Duran, Sara Fitouri, Francesca Lawrence, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wang, Elizabeth)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 24 July 2020. Before the Court is a First Amended Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand filed by the Plaintiffs as a matter of course pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). Plaintiffs shall comply with the local rule on or before July 28, 2020; if they fail to do so, the amended pleading may be stricken. (cmadr, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City and County of Denver, Colorado, Jacqueline A. Velasquez, M. Davis, Andrew Nielsen, Zachary Moldenhauer, Jacob Vaporis, Kevin Beasley, Chelsea Novotny, Christopher Cochran, Paul Hogan, Heather R. Jossi, Anthony E. Tak, J. LNU Attorney Elizabeth C. Wang added to party Joe Deras(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth C. Wang added to party Johnathen De La Vaca Duran(pty:pla), filed by Andy Sannier, Jacquelyn Parkins, Francesca Lawrence, Sara Fitouri, Ambrose Cruz, Kelsey Taylor, Youssef Amghar, Joe Deras, Johnathen De La Vaca Duran. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Wang, Elizabeth)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/20/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1922-DDD (angar, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01922-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 17 July 2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) #11 , the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Sara Fitouri, Francesca Lawrence, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor All parties do not consent.. (Wang, Elizabeth)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Charles Cooperstein on behalf of City and County of Denver, ColoradoAttorney David Charles Cooperstein added to party City and County of Denver, Colorado(pty:dft) (Cooperstein, David)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. City and County of Denver, Colorado served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (Wang, Elizabeth)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Cases by Plaintiffs Youssef Amghar, Ambrose Cruz, Sara Fitouri, Francesca Lawrence, Jacquelyn Parkins, Andy Sannier, Kelsey Taylor (Wang, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Tara Elizabeth Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Tara Elizabeth Thompson added to party Youssef Amghar(pty:pla), Attorney Tara Elizabeth Thompson added to party Ambrose Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Tara Elizabeth Thompson added to party Sara Fitouri(pty:pla), Attorney Tara Elizabeth Thompson added to party Francesca Lawrence(pty:pla), Attorney Tara Elizabeth Thompson added to party Jacquelyn Parkins(pty:pla), Attorney Tara Elizabeth Thompson added to party Andy Sannier(pty:pla), Attorney Tara Elizabeth Thompson added to party Kelsey Taylor(pty:pla) (Thompson, Tara)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Elizabeth C. Wang on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wang, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Moore Twetten on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Daniel Moore Twetten added to party Youssef Amghar(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Moore Twetten added to party Ambrose Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Moore Twetten added to party Sara Fitouri(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Moore Twetten added to party Francesca Lawrence(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Moore Twetten added to party Jacquelyn Parkins(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Moore Twetten added to party Andy Sannier(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Moore Twetten added to party Kelsey Taylor(pty:pla) (Twetten, Daniel)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1 July 2020. Consent Form due by 8/20/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due9/2/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1 July 2020. (cmadr, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City and County of Denver, DOES 1-10 (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7366135)Attorney Elizabeth C. Wang added to party Youssef Amghar(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth C. Wang added to party Ambrose Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth C. Wang added to party Sara Fitouri(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth C. Wang added to party Francesca Lawrence(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth C. Wang added to party Jacquelyn Parkins(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth C. Wang added to party Andy Sannier(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth C. Wang added to party Kelsey Taylor(pty:pla), filed by Andy Sannier, Jacquelyn Parkins, Francesca Lawrence, Sara Fitouri, Ambrose Cruz, Kelsey Taylor, Youssef Amghar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wang, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. City and County of Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Sannier
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Parkins
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Taylor
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youssef Amghar
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambrose Cruz
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesca Lawrence
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Fitouri
Represented By: Daniel Moore Twetten
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Deras
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathen Duran
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver, Colorado
Represented By: David Charles Cooperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather R. Jossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline A. Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Moldenhauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Vaporis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony E. Tak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?