Gonzales v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Kellie Laurren Gonzales
Defendant: Nate Brown, Florentino Velasquez, Vestas Tolkhill and Cooper and Turner, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01923
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT re: #4 Order Dismissing Case, by Clerk on 8/10/2020. (evana, )
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Plaintiff failed to cure the deficiency as directed. That all pending motions are denied as moot. That leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/10/2020. (evana, )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/2/2020. (evana, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against Nate Brown, Cooper and Turner, Inc., Vestas Tolkhill, Florentino Velasquez, filed by Kellie Laurren Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florentino Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vestas Tolkhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper and Turner, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Laurren Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?