Hays v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and Shawn Carstensen Hays
Defendant: Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc. and Pfizer Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01948
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Scheduling Conference which had been set for 9/24/2020 with Magistrate Judge Varholak is hereby VACATED and is re-set for 11/2/2020 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. This shall be a telephonic hearing and the parties shall call this number at the time of the hearing: 888-363-4749, Access Code 3136546#. Please provide draft scheduling order one week prior. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on August 26, 2020. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. This matter has its factual nexus in Mesa County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to Local Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 1:20-cv-01948-DDD-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/26/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 08/25/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01948-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Backer, Kali)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen added to party Pfizer Inc.(pty:dft) (Ingebretsen, Stephen)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kali R. Backer on behalf of All Defendants (Backer, Kali)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until 9/21/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/29/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Backer, Kali)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn Swisher on behalf of Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer Inc.Attorney Kathryn Swisher added to party Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Swisher added to party Pfizer Inc.(pty:dft) (Swisher, Kathryn)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Raj Gandesha on behalf of Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer Inc.Attorney Raj Gandesha added to party Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Raj Gandesha added to party Pfizer Inc.(pty:dft) (Gandesha, Raj)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Edward W. Thrasher on behalf of Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer Inc.Attorney Edward W. Thrasher added to party Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Edward W. Thrasher added to party Pfizer Inc.(pty:dft) (Thrasher, Edward)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Carstensen Hays. Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc. served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Lipman, Daniel)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Carstensen Hays. Pfizer Inc. served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Lipman, Daniel)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/6/2020. (jgonz, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7369554)Attorney Daniel A. Lipman added to party Shawn Carstensen Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A. Lipman added to party individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated(pty:pla), filed by Shawn Carstensen Hays, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Letter from Hospira, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons - Pfizer Inc., #4 Summons Summons - Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc.)(Lipman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hays v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Edward W. Thrasher
Represented By: Kali R. Backer
Represented By: Kathryn Swisher
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Raj Gandesha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Edward W. Thrasher
Represented By: Kali R. Backer
Represented By: Kathryn Swisher
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Raj Gandesha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel A. Lipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Carstensen Hays
Represented By: Daniel A. Lipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?