Mahan v. Rappold et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Mahan
Defendant: Thomas Trujillo, Carey Weinheimer, Benjamin Rappold and City of Boulder
Case Number: 1:2020cv01968
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER. PLEASE NOTE DATE CHANGE ONLY. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict on the Court calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for September 24, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to October 14, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed scheduling order shall be submitted on or before October 7, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/31/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Mahan. Thomas Trujillo waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Gibbs, Andrew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Mahan. Carey Weinheimer waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Gibbs, Andrew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Mahan. Benjamin Rappold waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Gibbs, Andrew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Mahan. City of Boulder waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Gibbs, Andrew)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Aquinas Carr on behalf of City of Boulder Attorney Thomas Aquinas Carr added to party City of Boulder (pty:dft) (Carr, Thomas)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Luis Angel Toro on behalf of City of Boulder Attorney Luis Angel Toro added to party City of Boulder (pty:dft) (Toro, Luis)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Goddard on behalf of Benjamin Rappold, Thomas Trujillo, Carey WeinheimerAttorney David M. Goddard added to party Benjamin Rappold(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Goddard added to party Thomas Trujillo(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Goddard added to party Carey Weinheimer(pty:dft) (Goddard, David)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Benjamin Rappold, individually; Thomas Trujillo, individually; Carey Weinheimer, individually; and City of Boulder by Plaintiff Christopher Mahan. (Gibbs, Andrew)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3] is September 10, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/16/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Christopher Mahan (Gibbs, Andrew)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/8/20, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/17/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/24/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (agarc, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against City of Boulder, Benjamin Rappold, Thomas Trujillo, Carey Weinheimer (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7372193)Attorney Andrew John Gibbs added to party Christopher Mahan(pty:pla), filed by Christopher Mahan.(Gibbs, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahan v. Rappold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Trujillo
Represented By: David M. Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey Weinheimer
Represented By: David M. Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Rappold
Represented By: David M. Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boulder
Represented By: Thomas Aquinas Carr
Represented By: Luis Angel Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mahan
Represented By: Andrew John Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?