McCormack v. Habimana et al
Plaintiff: Michael McCormack
Defendant: M Bard, C Fry, Christian Stob, Alain Habimana, M. Bard and C. Fry
Case Number: 1:2020cv01970
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines as follows. The telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for August 25, 2020, is VACATED AND RESET to October 20, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; all participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. The Parties shall file a Proposed Scheduling Order as well as send a copy in Word format to Wang_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov on or before October 13, 2020. And the Parties shall file a Consent/Non-consent Form on or before September 8, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/6/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines by Defendant Alain Habimana. (Horn, Michele)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michele Annette Horn on behalf of Alain HabimanaAttorney Michele Annette Horn added to party Alain Habimana(pty:dft) (Horn, Michele)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/7/20, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 8/11/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/18/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/25/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) .
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Rachel Maxam and Raymond Bryant. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against M Bard, C Fry, Alain Habimana, Christian Stob (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7372302)Attorney Raymond K. Bryant added to party Michael McCormack(pty:pla), filed by Michael McCormack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Bryant, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormack v. Habimana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Bard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Stob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alain Habimana
Represented By: Michele Annette Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McCormack
Represented By: Raymond K. Bryant
Represented By: Rachel B. Maxam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?