O'Connor v. Gallagher
Plaintiff: Andrew J. O'Connor
Defendant: Gordon P. Gallagher
Case Number: 1:2020cv01978
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/24/2020. (angar, )
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. If Plaintiff intended for the submitted documents to be filed in his pending action, O'Connor v. Gallagher, 20-cv-01765-KLM, he must notify the Court, in writing, within twenty-one days from the date of this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/17/2020. (angar, )
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Recusal, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/16/2020. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1978-KLM (angar, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor v. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon P. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?