Gonya v. Kelsey
Plaintiff: Paul Gonya
Defendant: Michelle Kelsey
Case Number: 1:2020cv01986
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CLOSING CASE re: Plaintiff's #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/2/2020. (cthom, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Paul Gonya (Waugh, Christian)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Michelle Kelsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Hafer, Edward)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 31 August 2020. For the Scheduling Conference currently set in this case on September 8, 2020, the Court will permit litigants (counsel and parties) and the public to appear at the conference either in person or by telephone. Anyone appearing in person must comply with General Order 2020-14 governing Court Operations During the COVID-19 Pandemic, which may be accessed at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Anyone appearing by telephone shall call the following conference line at the appointed time: Number: 888-278-0296, Access code: 8212991#. Please remember that, when you call in, you may be entering a proceeding already in progress for a different case; therefore, as you would if you were present in the courtroom, please ensure silence until your case is called. (cmadr, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 19 August 2020. Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answerto the Amended Complaint #12 is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the operative pleading on or before September 11, 2020. Please be advised that the Court will not grant a continuance of the Scheduling Conference based on the extension granted herein.(cmadr, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Ray Groves on behalf of Michelle KelseyAttorney Matthew Ray Groves added to party Michelle Kelsey(pty:dft) (Groves, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Michelle Kelsey. (Hafer, Edward)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Edward J. Hafer on behalf of Michelle KelseyAttorney Edward J. Hafer added to party Michelle Kelsey(pty:dft) (Hafer, Edward)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 July 2020. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause #7 . This Court's Order #5 is discharged. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate JudgeConsent Form #3 on or before August 19, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on September 8, 2020, at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. (cmadr, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #8 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Paul Gonya (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Pleading)(Waugh, Christian)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michelle Kelsey, filed by Paul Gonya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Theft Demand)(Waugh, Christian)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 by Plaintiff Paul Gonya. (Waugh, Christian)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DISCHARGED--ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 July 2020: returnable by Plaintiff. ORDERED that Plaintiff file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before July 22, 2020, demonstrating why the Court should not dismiss this case without prejudice (or recommend that it be dismissed without prejudice) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to #10 on 7/9/2020 (cmadr, ).
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Michelle Kelsey re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Paul Gonya. (Waugh, Christian)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (trvo, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michelle Kelsey (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7374688)Attorney Christian W. Waugh added to party Paul Gonya(pty:pla), filed by Paul Gonya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Theft Demand)(Waugh, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonya v. Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Kelsey
Represented By: Edward J. Hafer
Represented By: Matthew Ray Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gonya
Represented By: Christian W. Waugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?