Medina v. Mott
Plaintiff: Ernest Medina
Defendant: Mott
Case Number: 1:2020cv01987
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #7 Order Reassigning Case, Clerk's Judgment, #6 Order Dismissing Case, Addressed to Ernest Medina. (apesa, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #6 Order Dismissing Case on 8/17/2020. (apesa, )
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED that the Complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with the July 8, 2020, Order, within the time allowed, and for failure to prosecute.FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal isdenied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/17/2020. (apesa, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #3 Order, Addressed to Ernest Medina. (apesa, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 2 Case Assigned to Judge, #1 Complaint Addressed to Ernest Medina. (evana, )
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty days from the date of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/8/2020. (apesa, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Mott, Officer John Doe 1, Officer John Doe 2, Officer John Doe 3, filed by Ernest Medina.(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?