Huggins v. Long et al
Petitioner: Chester Huggins
Respondent: Jeff Long and Philip Weiser
Case Number: 1:2020cv01998
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Pre-Answer Response (ECF No. #13 ) is granted to and including October 2, 2020. Within twenty-one days of the Respondents filing the Pre-Answer Response, Applicant may file a Reply, if he desires, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/31/2020.(angar, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Respondents Jeff Long, Philip Weiser. (Holman, Matthew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 Acceptance of Service on behalf of Jeff Long on 8/14/2020(angar, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #5 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #9 Order to File a Pre-Answer Response for Service of Process. (jtorr, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #9 Order to File a Pre-Answer Response for Service of Process. (jtorr, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Within twenty-one days from the date of this Order the Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with this Order. Within twenty-one days of the Respondents filing the Pre-Answer Response, Applicant may file a Reply, if he desires. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on August 12, 2020. (rvill, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #2 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF No. 6) filed July 16, 2020, is denied as moot, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/12/2020.(angar, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 3 Case Assigned to Judge, #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Addressed to Chester Huggins. (angar, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Petitioner Chester Huggins. (angar, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254, filed by Chester Huggins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(angar, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies as directed within thirty days from the date of this Order this action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/9/2020. (angar, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Petitioner Chester Huggins. (jtorr, ) Modified to add text on 7/8/2020 (jtorr, ).
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Chester Huggins.(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huggins v. Long et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Long
Represented By: Matthew S. Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Philip Weiser
Represented By: Matthew S. Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chester Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?