Jarvis v. Correct Care Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Jarvis
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Mesa County, Matt Lewis, Kurtis Holmes, Nickole Chantel Croomes, Heather Stanford, Denise McAllister, Shawna Rochelle Christensen, Heather Martinez, Katelyn Stults, Renee Workman, Shelly Kay Lambert, L McLaughlin, Correct Care Solutions LLC, Wellpath LLC and Alissa Embree-Nicholson
Case Number: 1:2020cv02028
Filed: July 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Correct Care Solutions LLC and Wellpath LLC may have up to and including 10/5/2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/3/2020. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Correct Care Solutions LLC, Wellpath LLC. (Sargent, Craig)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jarvis. Wellpath LLC served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Wellpath)(Trine, Cheryl)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Jarvis. Board of County Commissioners of Mesa County waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020; Matt Lewis waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Mesa County, #2 Summons Sheriff Lewis)(Trine, Cheryl)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jarvis. Correct Care Solutions LLC served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons CCS)(Trine, Cheryl)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
August 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST re #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff James Jarvis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Trine, Cheryl)
July 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Jarvis.(Trine, Cheryl)
July 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Summons not issued. (jsalz, )
July 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT And Jury Demand against Board of County Commissioners of Mesa County, Shawna Christensen, Correct Care Solutions LLC, Nickole Croomes, Alissa Embree-Nicholson, Kurtis Holmes, Shelly Lambert, Matt Lewis, Heather Martinez, Denise McAllister, L McLaughlin, Heather Stanford, Katelyn Stultz, Wellpath LLC, Renee Workman (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7382023)Attorney Cheryl Louise Trine added to party James Jarvis(pty:pla), filed by James Jarvis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trine, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarvis v. Correct Care Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Mesa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurtis Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickole Chantel Croomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawna Rochelle Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katelyn Stults
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Kay Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions LLC
Represented By: Craig A. Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath LLC
Represented By: Craig A. Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alissa Embree-Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jarvis
Represented By: Cheryl Louise Trine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?