Camarillo v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Daniel Camarillo
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02061
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441bc
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Queenan, Gordon)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER re: #20 Memorandum Returning Case. In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 9/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 9/9/2020 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/28/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2061-RBJ (angar, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02061-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 August 2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #17 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Queenan, Gordon)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3 August 2020. Before the Court is Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF #15 ). In light of the information provided by the Defendant, this Courts Order (ECF #14 ) is discharged. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF 5 ) on or before August 27, 2020. It is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on September 16, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado.Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/9/2020. (cmadr, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Court's July 17, 2020 Order to Show Cause re #14 by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Queenan, Gordon)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCHARGEDORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 17 July 2020: returnable by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. ORDERED that Defendant file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before July 31, 2020, demonstrating why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to #16 . on 8/3/2020 (cmadr, ).
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to # 12 Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02061-MEH. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: This case was originally filed in the El Paso County District Court. It appears that the El Paso County District Court lacked venue. Upon removal, the case was thereafter assigned to JD-4 as a result. The proper assignment for the case is JD-1 based on the residency of the Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is therefore ORDERED to re-assign the matter to JD-1 and to re-draw the presiding judicial officer(s). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/16/2020. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kristopher Craig Miller on behalf of Daniel CamarilloAttorney Kristopher Craig Miller added to party Daniel Camarillo(pty:pla) (Miller, Kristopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. JD4 and MJ CIV PP flags set. (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND to #7 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and summons upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 6/15/2020 (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Daniel Camarillo.(jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Gordon A. Queenan by Gordon Alec Queenan on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Gordon Alec Queenan added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Queenan, Gordon)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Franklin D. Patterson by Franklin D. Patterson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Patterson, Franklin)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Patterson, Franklin)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2020CV031074. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7388037), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Answer, #6 Exhibit F - SOS Summary, #7 Exhibit G - Order to File Jnt CMC, #8 Exhibit H - Disc Protocol Order, #9 Exhibit I - Amended Order to File Jnt CMC, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patterson, Franklin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camarillo v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Franklin D. Patterson
Represented By: Gordon Alec Queenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Camarillo
Represented By: Kristopher Craig Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?