Cobbs v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Carrie Cobbs
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02072
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company All parties do not consent.. (Kust, Katherine)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER. PLEASE NOTE DATE CHANGE ONLY. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict on the Court calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for September 24, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to September 29, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed scheduling order shall be submitted on or before September 22, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/31/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Kust, Katherine)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company. USAA General Indemnity Company answer due 7/29/2020. (Kust, Katherine)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Carrie CobbsAttorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Carrie Cobbs(pty:pla) (LaCrue, DezaRae)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/16/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/17/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/24/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#7] is September 10, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/16/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons upon USAA General Indemnity Company on 06/17/2020. (cpomm, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against USAA General Indemnity Company, filed by Carrie Cobbs.(cpomm, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon F. Sands on behalf of USAA General Indemnity CompanyAttorney Jon F. Sands added to party USAA General Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Sands, Jon)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA General Indemnity Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020CV031203. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7388832), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Kust, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobbs v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Katherine Karamalegos Kust
Represented By: Jon F. Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Cobbs
Represented By: DezaRae D. LaCrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?