Bridger v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Vicki Bridger
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02088
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/11/2020. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 25 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Vicki Bridger. (Bachus, J.)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM regarding #23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/11/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 10, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Evan)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Stipulated Motion to Vacate August 19, 2020, Scheduling Conference. The telephonic Scheduling Conference originally set for Augusts 19, 2020, is VACATED and RESET for September 17, 2020 at 1:00 PM. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. The Parties shall file a Proposed Scheduling Order and send a copy in Word format to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov on or before September 10, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/6/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1)
August 4, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM regarding #20 Stipulated MOTION to Vacate the August 19, 2020, Scheduling Conference filed by Vicki Bridger. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/4/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION to Vacate the August 19, 2020, Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Vicki Bridger. (Turpen, Giorgia)
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Stephenson, Evan)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/4/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/4/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Raymond P. Moore for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2088-RM (angar, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02088-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Vicki Bridger All parties do not consent.. (Turpen, Giorgia)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer due 8/7/2020. (Stephenson, Evan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/21/20, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 8/5/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/12/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Darin L. Schanker on behalf of Vicki BridgerAttorney Darin L. Schanker added to party Vicki Bridger(pty:pla) (Schanker, Darin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Giorgia Balin Turpen on behalf of Vicki BridgerAttorney Giorgia Balin Turpen added to party Vicki Bridger(pty:pla) (Turpen, Giorgia)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By Elizabeth Ann Wishaupl, Arapahoe County District Court Judge on 7/7/2020. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons; Civil Complaint and Jury Demand; and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 6/19/2020. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Vicki Bridger.(jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, Evan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020-cv-31137. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7391559), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 State Court - Complaint, #3 State Court - Affidavit of Service, #4 State Court - Civil Court Cover Sheet, #5 State Court - Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Responsive Pleading, #6 State Court - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridger v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Evan Bennett Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Bridger
Represented By: Darin L. Schanker
Represented By: Giorgia Balin Turpen
Represented By: J. Kyle Bachus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?