Wolfe et al v. City of Woodland Park et al
Plaintiff: Rocio Beltran and Colton Wolfe
Defendant: Miles De Young, Miles (I) De Young, City of Woodland Park, Teller County, Jason (I) Mikesell, Greg Geiman, Jason Mikesell, Greg (I) Couch, Greg Couch and Greg (I) Geiman
Case Number: 1:2020cv02089
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Doe 11 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
September 2, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Doe 10 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Doe 9 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
September 2, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Doe 8 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
September 2, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Doe 5 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
September 2, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Doe 4 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
September 2, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Doe 3 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Doe 1 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Doe 6 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton) Modified on 9/2/2020 to correct text (athom, ).
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Doe 7 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton) Modified on 9/2/2020 to correct text (athom, ).
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Doe 2 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton) Modified on 9/2/2020 (athom, ).
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 Administrative Notice: The #6 , #10 , #11 Summonses submitted will not be issued - the party names listed on the summons request are not named parties in this action. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Woodland Park by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Teller County by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ryan Koski by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Mike Greeder by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jason Mikesell by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Greg Geiman by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Greg Couch by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chris Adams by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jane Doe 1 by Plaintiff Colton Wolfe. (Wolfe, Colton) Modified on 8/28/2020 to correct text (athom, ).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/17/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (agarc, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against City of Woodland Park, Greg Couch, Greg (I) Couch, Miles De Young, Miles (I) De Young, Greg Geiman, Greg (I) Geiman, Jason Mikesell, Jason (I) Mikesell, and Teller County (Filing Fee: $400.00; Receipt Number:COX095779), filed by Rocio Beltran, and Colton Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Signature page, #2 Receipt)(agarc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe et al v. City of Woodland Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles De Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles (I) De Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Woodland Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teller County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason (I) Mikesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Geiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Mikesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg (I) Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg (I) Geiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocio Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colton Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?