Safeco Insurance Company of America v Kelly et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Jackson Belcher and Chad Patrick Kelly
Case Number: 1:2020cv02091
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michelle B. Cortes on behalf of Chad Patrick KellyAttorney Michelle B. Cortes added to party Chad Patrick Kelly(pty:dft) (Cortes, Michelle)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert M. Baldwin on behalf of Chad Patrick KellyAttorney Robert M. Baldwin added to party Chad Patrick Kelly(pty:dft) (Baldwin, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Brief in Support Thereof by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Spano, Brian)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER re: 12 Case Reassigned. In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 9/28/2020 before Magistrate Judge Mix is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 9/21/2020 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/31/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02091-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
August 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/30/20 re: #10 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. At least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of America All parties do not consent.. (Spano, Brian)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy James Luetkemeyer on behalf of Jackson BelcherAttorney Timothy James Luetkemeyer added to party Jackson Belcher(pty:dft) (Luetkemeyer, Timothy)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Aleinikoff on behalf of Jackson BelcherAttorney Brian Aleinikoff added to party Jackson Belcher(pty:dft) (Aleinikoff, Brian)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bruce Lowell Braley on behalf of Jackson BelcherAttorney Bruce Lowell Braley added to party Jackson Belcher(pty:dft) (Braley, Bruce)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Jackson Belcher waiver sent on 8/14/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Spano, Brian)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/23/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/21/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/28/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Chad Patrick Kelly waiver sent on 7/22/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Spano, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/27/2020) (jsalz, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/27/2020) (jsalz, ).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jackson Belcher, Chad Patrick Kelly (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7391775)Attorney Brian John Spano added to party SAFECO Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), filed by SAFECO Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Chad Kelly, #4 Summons to Jackson Belcher)(Spano, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Belcher
Represented By: Brian Aleinikoff
Represented By: Timothy James Luetkemeyer
Represented By: Bruce Lowell Braley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Patrick Kelly
Represented By: Robert M. Baldwin
Represented By: Michelle B. Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?