Round v. US Department of Agriculture, Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Ralph D. Round
Defendant: Sonny Perdue, Sonny (I) Perdue, Steve Keefer, Vicki Christiansen, Diana (I) Trujillo, Patricia (I) Hessenflow, Diana Trujillo, Jennifer Eberlien, John (I) Linn, USDA Forest Service, John Linn, Steve (I) Keefer, Patricia Hessenflow, Vicki (I) Christiansen, Colorado Parks & Wildlife Commission and Jennifer (I) Eberlien
Case Number: 1:2020cv02092
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/09/2020. Defendants Colorado Parks & Wildlife Commission's and Steve Keefer's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time [#36 ] is granted. On or before 9/23/2020, defendants Colorado Parks & Wildlife Commission and Steve Keefer shall file an answer or other response to the complaint. (athom, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Colorado Parks & Wildlife Commission, Steve Keefer. (Haller, William)
August 31, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph D. Round. Steve (I) Keefer served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Ballard, Hayden)
August 31, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph D. Round. Colorado Parks & Wildlife Commission served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Ballard, Hayden)
August 31, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph D. Round. Patricia (I) Hessenflow served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Ballard, Hayden)
August 31, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph D. Round. John (I) Linn served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Ballard, Hayden)
August 31, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph D. Round. Diana (I) Trujillo served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Ballard, Hayden)
August 31, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph D. Round. Jennifer (I) Eberlien served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Ballard, Hayden)
August 31, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph D. Round. Vicki (I) Christiansen served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Ballard, Hayden)
August 31, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph D. Round. Sonny (I) Perdue served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Ballard, Hayden)
August 31, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) USDA Forest Service served on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 21, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Steve Keefer by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 21, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Parks & Wildlife Commission by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 21, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Patricia Hessenflow by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 21, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Linn by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 21, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Diana Trujillo by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 21, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jennifer Eberlien by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Vicki Christiansen by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sonny Perdue by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States Department of Agriculture, Forest Service by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 Administrative Notice: The 7-15 Summonses submitted are incomplete and will not be issued. All defendants must be listed in the caption - et al can not be used. Please complete the forms for issuance using the event Summons Request. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Steve Keefer by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Parks & Wildlife Commission by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Patricia Hessenflow by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John Linn by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Diana Trujillo by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jennifer Eberlien by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Vicki Christiansen by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sonny Perdue by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States Department of Agriculture, Forest Service by Plaintiff Ralph D. Round. (Ballard, Hayden)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02092-REB. (Text only entry.) (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $400, receipt number COX095790 (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vicki Christiansen, Colorado Parks & Wildlife, Jennifer Eberlien, USDA Forest Service, Patricia Hessenflow, Steve Keefer, John Linn, Sonny Perdue, Diana Trujillo (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Hayden Lynn Ballard added to party Ralph D. Round(pty:pla), filed by Ralph D. Round. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ballard, Hayden)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Round v. US Department of Agriculture, Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph D. Round
Represented By: Hayden Lynn Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny (I) Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Keefer
Represented By: William Cory Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana (I) Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia (I) Hessenflow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Eberlien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USDA Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve (I) Keefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Hessenflow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki (I) Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Parks & Wildlife Commission
Represented By: William Cory Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer (I) Eberlien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?