McDaniel v. USA
Plaintiff: Tonya McDaniel
Defendant: Russell Poole, Colorado Coalition for the Homeless, Carol Rykiel and USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv02101
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Torres Declaration)(Bobet, Jane)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER re: #18 Letter and #19 Letter filed by USA. Having reviewed the parties' letters, the defendant may file its motion. At this point the Court is still unclear as to what specific administrative remedies were available to the plaintiff and which of those remedies she did or did not pursue before filing a lawsuit. However, as I warned the plaintiff previously, see ECF No. 17, it will be very difficult for the plaintiff to successfully prosecute a dental malpractice lawsuit. In addition to the normal difficulties pro se litigants face in trying to represent themselves in court, a malpractice case requires an expert qualified in the same specialty area as the accused professionals (dentistry) who is willing to testify that the accused dentists were negligent and caused injury. It will be difficult for the plaintiff to find and afford the charges of such an expert. That is why I suggested a more practical way to proceed. If no cost or low cost remedial care has been offered to the plaintiff, but she has insisted instead on being paid money, as the defendant's letter, ECF No. 19 states, then I think she might be making a big mistake. That's all the advice that I, as the judge in the case, can provide. I cannot serve as a lawyer for plaintiff. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/24/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER re: 17 Minute Order,,, by Defendant USA. (Bobet, Jane)
August 7, 2020 Filing 18 Pre Motion Letter from Tonya McDaniel (Attachments: #1 Letter) (apesa, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed the letters. The defendant might be technically right that plaintiff has not properly exhausted her administrative remedies, and it may file its motion. Even if I were to agree with the defendant, and the plaintiff exhausts and then files a new suit, she will face the daunting task of obtaining an expert to testify as to the alleged malpractice. Meanwhile, she is apparently in pain. Neither party needs a lawsuit. I don't know whether a drill bit was left in the plaintiff's mouth, but if it was, sooner or later the defendants have some exposure. What about fixing her dental problems without charge and mooting the case, folks? By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/8/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 PRE MOTION LETTER from Tonya McDaniel (apesa, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER regarding Defendant's anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendant USA. (Bobet, Jane)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02101-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USA All parties do not consent.. (Bobet, Jane)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 24 July 2020. It is hereby ORDERED that the United States of America's Motion to Substitute the United States as Defendant #2 is GRANTED. The United States of America is substituted as the sole Defendant in this case in place of Defendants Colorado Coalition for the Homeless "Champa Dental Clinic," Rykiel, and Poole. It is further ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #11 is GRANTED. The United States shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #3 on or before July 31, 2020. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint by Defendants Colorado Coalition for the Homeless, Russell Poole, Carol Rykiel. (Bobet, Jane)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT by Defendants Colorado Coalition for the Homeless, Russell Poole, Carol Rykiel. (Bobet, Jane)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Defendants Colorado Coalition for the Homeless, Russell Poole, Carol Rykiel (Bobet, Jane)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re 8 to Tonya McDaniel 14270 East 104th Avenue Unit 1-212 Mailbox #72 Commerce City, CO 80022. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 21 July 2020. Consent Form due by 9/9/2020. Status Conference set for 9/23/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Status Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of thisOrder to Plaintiff. (cmadr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Pre Trial Order upon Aaron Crowder on 4/27/2020. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Colorado Coalition for the Homeless, Russell Poole, Carol Rykiel, filed by Tonya McDaniel.(jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party by Defendants Colorado Coalition for the Homeless Champa Dental Clinic, Russell Poole, Carol Rykiel. (Bobet, Jane)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Russell Poole, Carol Rykiel, Colorado Coalition for the Homeless Champa Dental Clinic from Denver County - District, Case Number 2020CV000193., filed by Russell Poole, Carol Rykiel, Colorado Coalition for the Homeless Champa Dental Clinic. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Deeming, #3 US Attorney Certification, #4 Affidavit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Bobet, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Poole
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Coalition for the Homeless
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Rykiel
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?