Mobile Epiphany, LLC v. Redline Global, LLC
Petitioner: Mobile Epiphany, LLC
Respondent: Global Redline, LLC and Redline Global, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02105
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/19/20 re: #12 Minute Order in favor of Mobile Epiphany, LLC and against Redline Global, LLC (lgale, )
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/17/20 re: #11 Consent for Confirmation of Arbitration Award. It is hereby ORDERED that the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award #1 is GRANTED. The Arbitration Award attached to the Complaint as Exhibit 2 [1-2] is CONFIRMED. It is further ORDERED that judgment shall enter in favor of Mobile Epiphany, LLC and against Redline Global, LLC for $775,000.00 plus interest 8% per annum on any unpaid portion. (lgale, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent for Confirmation - Arbitration Award by Respondent Redline Global, LLC (Caban, Brett)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brett Benjamin Caban on behalf of Redline Global, LLCAttorney Brett Benjamin Caban added to party Redline Global, LLC(pty:res) (Caban, Brett)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/3/20 re: #1 Petition filed by Mobile Epiphany, LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall file a Response to the Petition [#1] on or before August 17, 2020. Plaintiff may file a Reply on or before September 7, 2020. (nmarb, )
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #6 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/28/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas Dowd regarding Notice of Petition by Petitioner Mobile Epiphany, LLC. (Dowd, Nicholas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Petitioner Mobile Epiphany, LLC All parties consent.. (Dowd, Nicholas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #4 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Nicholas W. Dowd. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, signature block must contain full address of attorney.(Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas William Dowd on behalf of Mobile Epiphany, LLCAttorney Nicholas William Dowd added to party Mobile Epiphany, LLC(pty:pet) (Dowd, Nicholas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7392746)Attorney William M. Ojile, Jr added to party Mobile Epiphany, LLC(pty:pet), filed by Mobile Epiphany, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Ojile, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile Epiphany, LLC v. Redline Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Global Redline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Redline Global, LLC
Represented By: Brett Benjamin Caban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mobile Epiphany, LLC
Represented By: William M. Ojile, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas William Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?