Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co. v. Pila et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co. and Almont Anglers, LLC
Defendant: Mistras Group, Inc. and Jose A. Pila
Case Number: 1:2020cv02118
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 tl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/4/20 GRANTING #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Proposed Scheduling Order now due by 10/26/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/20 at 9:30 AM is VACATED and RESET to 11/2/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(nmarb, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Mistras Group, Inc., Jose A. Pila. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rock, David) Modified on 9/2/2020 (apesa, ).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, all counsel or parties who wish to participate in, or members of the public who wish to listen into, the Status Conference set on September 14, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE by calling the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/24/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion [#18] is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint [#5] is extended to September 23, 2020, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/18/2020.(evana, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Mistras Group, Inc., Jose A. Pila. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rock, David)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 14 August 2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/7/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ.P. 16(b) shall be held on September 14, 2020, commencing at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#8] is August 31, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/14/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/10/20 GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Mistras Group, Inc. answer due 8/24/2020; Jose A. Pila answer due 8/24/2020.(nmarb, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Enger, Colin)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #12 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorneyColin Enger. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colin Lin Enger on behalf of Almont Anglers, LLC, Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co. Attorney Colin Lin Enger added to party Almont Anglers, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Colin Lin Enger added to party Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co. (pty:pla) (Enger, Colin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ian Andrew Cooper on behalf of Mistras Group, Inc., Jose A. Pila (Cooper, Ian)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David J. Rock on behalf of Mistras Group, Inc., Jose A. PilaAttorney David J. Rock added to party Mistras Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Rock added to party Jose A. Pila(pty:dft) (Rock, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Defendants Mistras Group and Jose Pila's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Mistras Group, Inc., Jose A. Pila. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Ian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (agarc, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER re: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Gunnison County District Judge James Steven Patrick dated 7/8/2020. (agarc, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summonsand Complaint upon Mitras Group, Inc. on 6/19/2020. (agarc, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT in Equitable Subrogation against Mistras Group, Inc., and Jose A. Pila, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co., and Almont Anglers, LLC.(agarc, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Cooper, Ian)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mistras Group Inc, Jose A Pila from Gunnison County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30021. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7394842), filed by Mistras Group Inc, Jose A Pila. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cooper, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co. v. Pila et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co.
Represented By: Colin L. Enger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almont Anglers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mistras Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Andrew Cooper
Represented By: David J. Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Pila
Represented By: Ian Andrew Cooper
Represented By: David J. Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?