Shelter General Insurance Company v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The
Plaintiff: Shelter General Insurance Company
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv02160
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332bw
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/8/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/4/2020, re: #23 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The. ORDERED that the Orders to Show Cause, Docket Nos. 17, 21, are hereby DISCHARGED. (sphil, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #21 by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Steiner, Jamie)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER Due to the current Order to Show Cause issued by Chief Judge Brimmer, the Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2020 is VACATED. If this case is not remanded to state court, counsel shall jointly call the chambers of Magistrate Judge Crews (303.335.2124) to reset the Scheduling Conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/31/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Second ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/28/2020. ORDERED that, on or before September 4, 2020, defendant shall show cause why this case should not be remanded due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Shelter General Insurance Company. (Moore, Donald)
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Donald George Moore on behalf of Shelter General Insurance CompanyAttorney Donald George Moore added to party Shelter General Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Moore, Donald)
August 26, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #17 by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Steiner, Jamie)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/21/2020. ORDERED that, on or before August 28, 2020, defendant shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02160-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Steiner, Jamie)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by David Matthew Stauss on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The (Stauss, David)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/26/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #12 ) is due on or before 8/26/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/27/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT to #9 Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The.(jsalz, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and complaint upon Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company on 6/22/2020 (jsalz, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The, filed by Shelter General Insurance Company.(jsalz, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The.(Stauss, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jamie H. Steiner on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, TheAttorney Jamie H. Steiner added to party Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The(pty:dft) (Steiner, Jamie)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Matthew Stauss on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The (Stauss, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stauss, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The from District Court, County of Washington, Denver, Case Number 2020CV30013. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7398966), filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket from State Court Action, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint from State Court Action, #3 Exhibit C - Summons from State Court Action, #4 Exhibit D - Return of Service from State Court Action, #5 Exhibit E - Goodyear Business Entity Detail, #6 Exhibit F - Email Regarding Damages)(Stauss, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelter General Insurance Company v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelter General Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald George Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The
Represented By: David Matthew Stauss
Represented By: Jamie H. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?