Scalia v. Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp.
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor and Eugene Scalia
Defendant: Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp., dba Micro Metals, Inc. and Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp. a Colorado corporation doing business as Micro Metals. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02169
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:0662
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp. All parties do not consent.. (Miller, Patrick)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Summer Christine Silversmith on behalf of Eugene ScaliaAttorney Summer Christine Silversmith added to party Eugene Scalia(pty:pla) (Silversmith, Summer)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dana M. Svendsen on behalf of Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp.Attorney Dana M. Svendsen added to party Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp.(pty:dft) (Svendsen, Dana)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Miller, Patrick)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Patrick John Miller on behalf of Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp. (Miller, Patrick)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick John Miller on behalf of Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp.Attorney Patrick John Miller added to party Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp.(pty:dft) (Miller, Patrick)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp. waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (McLeod, Tyler)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/27/2020. (ksena)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/24/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/24/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (alave, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp., dba Micro Metals, Inc. Attorney Tyler Philip McLeod added to party Secretary of Labor(pty:pla), filed by Secretary of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McLeod, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp., dba Micro Metals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp. a Colorado corporation doing business as Micro Metals. Inc.
Represented By: Patrick John Miller
Represented By: Dana M. Svendsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor
Represented By: Tyler Philip McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Tyler Philip McLeod
Represented By: Summer Christine Silversmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?