First Specialty Insurance Corporation v. Calmante Owners Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Calmante Owners Association, Inc., Lifestyle Capital Holdings, LLC, Debbie Barker, Boulder Creek Builders, LLC, Calmante Residential Investments, LLC, Steven A. Erickson, Betty Gallegos, Boulder Creek Calmante, LLC, DC Calmante, LLC, Michael Sinkey, David Chaknova and Boulder Creek Neighborhoods, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02220
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2220-CMA (angar, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 27 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #26 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02220-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 26 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff First Specialty Insurance Corporation All parties do not consent.. (Jaworsky, Todd)
September 22, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. Calmante Owners Association, Inc. waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. Steven A. Erickson waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. Michael Sinkey waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. Lifestyle Capital Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. Boulder Creek Neighborhoods, LLC waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. Boulder Creek Calmante, LLC waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. Boulder Creek Builders, LLC waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DAVID CHAKNOVA by Plaintiff First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DC CALMANTE, LLC by Plaintiff First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to CALMANTE RESIDENTIAL INVESTMENTS, LLC by Plaintiff First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 Administrative Notice re #11 and #12 : Summonses submitted contain an incomplete caption and will not be issued. All parties must be listed in the caption; using "Et al" is not allowed. Please file completed summonses for issuance using the event "Summons Request." (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DC CALMANTE, LLC by Plaintiff First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to CALMANTE RESIDENTIAL INVESTMENTS, LLC by Plaintiff First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Blumhardt, Kristi)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #8 filed by attorneys Kristi Lynn Blumhardt & Todd Evan Jaworsky.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 September 2020. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule the October 8, 2020 Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set on October 8, 2020 is CONVERTED to a Telephonic Status Conference. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Jaworsky, Todd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kristi Lynn Blumhardt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kristi Lynn Blumhardt added to party First Specialty Insurance Corporation(pty:pla) (Blumhardt, Kristi)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Betty Gallegos and Debbie Barker by Plaintiff First Specialty Insurance Corporation (Jaworsky, Todd)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 28 July 2020. Consent Form due by 9/24/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/1/2020 Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent SR Corporate Solutions America Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Swiss Re Corporate Solutions Ltd, Corporate Parent Swiss Re Ltd, Corporate Parent Westport Insurance Corporation for First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Jaworsky, Todd)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7407556)Attorney Todd Evan Jaworsky added to party First Specialty Insurance Corporation(pty:pla), filed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jaworsky, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Specialty Insurance Corporation v. Calmante Owners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calmante Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifestyle Capital Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Creek Builders, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calmante Residential Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Creek Calmante, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC Calmante, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sinkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Chaknova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Creek Neighborhoods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Todd Evan Jaworsky
Represented By: Kristi Lynn Blumhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?