Boateng v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bernard Boateng
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02225
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #14 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed in this case on 09/11/2020. Text Only Entry (angar, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Lazar, Cheri)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 August 2020. Before the Court is Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company's Notice of Settlement (ECF #12 ). The parties shall file dismissal papers on or before September 28, 2020. Additionally, the scheduling conference set for September 9, 2020 is vacated. (cmadr, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Lazar, Cheri)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Henkel, Kurt)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 31 July 2020. This Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on September 9, 2020, at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/2/2020. (cmadr, )
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/ 30/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/30/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua Ty Hotchkiss on behalf of Bernard BoatengAttorney Joshua Ty Hotchkiss added to party Bernard Boateng(pty:pla) (Hotchkiss, Joshua)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cheri R. Lazar on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Cheri R. Lazar added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lazar, Cheri)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Bernard Boateng.(jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2020cv032268. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7408389), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Henkel, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boateng v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Boateng
Represented By: Joshua Ty Hotchkiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Cheri R. Lazar
Represented By: Kurt Hans Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?